J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Parayno
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Michael D. Parayno
Case Number: 3:2011cv05424
Filed: November 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 27, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE AND DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/24/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; GRANTING 15 MOTION TO DISMISS; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON 14 MOTION TO STRIKE. Opposition due by 4/16/2012. Replies due by 4/23/2012. Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/26/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Parayno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Parayno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?