GMAC Mortgage LLC v. Lopez
Plaintiff: GMAC Mortgage LLC
Defendant: Miguel Lopez
Case Number: 3:2011cv05475
Filed: November 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/5/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/15/2011 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 12/1/2011.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/17/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER Directing Defendant to File Consent/Declination. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 11/16/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GMAC Mortgage LLC v. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GMAC Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Kajal Nasreen Islam
Represented By: Tracey Lynn Merrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?