Anthony et al v. National Basketball Association et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Carmello Anthony, Chauncey Billups, Kevin Durant, Kawhi Leonard and Leon Powe
Defendant: National Basketball Association, Atlanta Hawks, LP, Banner Seventeen LLC, Bobcats Basketball, LLC, Chicago Professional Sports Limited Partnership, Cavaliers Operating Company, LLC, Dallas Basketball Limited, Denver Nuggets Limited Partnership, Detroit Pistons Basketball Company, Golden State Warriors, LLC, Rocket Ball, Ltd., Pacers Basketball LLC, LAC Basketball Club, Inc., Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., Hoops, L.P., Miami Heat Limited Partnership, Milwaulkee Bucks, Inc., Minnesota Timberwolves Basketball Limited Partnership, New Jersey Basketball, LLC, New Orleans Hornets NBA Limited Partnership, Madison Square Garden, L.P., Professional Basketball Club, LLC, Orlando Magic, Ltd., Philadelphia 76ers L.P., Suns Legacy Partners, L.L.C., Trail Blazers, Inc., Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership, LP, San Antonio Spurs, L.L.C., Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Jazz Basketball Investors, Inc. and Washington Bullets, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2011cv05525
Filed: November 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2011 Filing 7 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Samuel Conti for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Richard Wieking for the Executive Committee on 11/17/2011. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 16, 2011 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 16, 2011 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Atlanta Hawks, LP, Banner Seventeen LLC, Bobcats Basketball, LLC, Cavaliers Operating Company, LLC, Chicago Professional Sports Limited Partnership, Dallas Basketball Limited, Denver Nuggets Limited Partnership, Detroit Pistons Basketball Company, Golden State Warriors, LLC, Hoops, L.P., Jazz Basketball Investors, Inc., LAC Basketball Club, Inc., Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., Madison Square Garden, L.P., Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Miami Heat Limited Partnership, Milwaulkee Bucks, Inc., Minnesota Timberwolves Basketball Limited Partnership, National Basketball Association, New Jersey Basketball, LLC, New Orleans Hornets NBA Limited Partnership, Orlando Magic, Ltd., Pacers Basketball LLC, Philadelphia 76ers L.P., Professional Basketball Club, LLC, Rocket Ball, Ltd., Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership, LP, San Antonio Spurs, L.L.C., Suns Legacy Partners, L.L.C., Trail Blazers, Inc., Washington Bullets, L.P.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 16, 2011 Filing 3 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Carmello Anthony, Chauncey Billups, Kevin Durant, Kawhi Leonard, Leon Powe and all those similarly situated. (Cove, John) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2012. Case Management Conference set for 2/29/2012 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with jury demand against Atlanta Hawks, LP, Banner Seventeen LLC, Bobcats Basketball, LLC, Cavaliers Operating Company, LLC, Chicago Professional Sports Limited Partnership, Dallas Basketball Limited, Denver Nuggets Limited Partnership, Detroit Pistons Basketball Company, Golden State Warriors, LLC, Hoops, L.P., Jazz Basketball Investors, Inc., LAC Basketball Club, Inc., Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., Madison Square Garden, L.P., Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Miami Heat Limited Partnership, Milwaulkee Bucks, Inc., Minnesota Timberwolves Basketball Limited Partnership, National Basketball Association, New Jersey Basketball, LLC, New Orleans Hornets NBA Limited Partnership, Orlando Magic, Ltd., Pacers Basketball LLC, Philadelphia 76ers L.P., Professional Basketball Club, LLC, Rocket Ball, Ltd., Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership, LP, San Antonio Spurs, L.L.C., Suns Legacy Partners, L.L.C., Trail Blazers, Inc., Washington Bullets, L.P. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 44611007909.). Filed byKawhi Leonard, Carmello Anthony, Chauncey Billups, Leon Powe, Kevin Durant. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011) Modified on 11/16/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony et al v. National Basketball Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmello Anthony
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: David L. Greenspan
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chauncey Billups
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: David L. Greenspan
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Durant
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: David L. Greenspan
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kawhi Leonard
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: David L. Greenspan
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Powe
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: David L. Greenspan
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Basketball Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlanta Hawks, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banner Seventeen LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobcats Basketball, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Professional Sports Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavaliers Operating Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Basketball Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Nuggets Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit Pistons Basketball Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden State Warriors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocket Ball, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacers Basketball LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAC Basketball Club, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Lakers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoops, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Heat Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaulkee Bucks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Timberwolves Basketball Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Jersey Basketball, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans Hornets NBA Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Square Garden, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Basketball Club, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Magic, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia 76ers L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suns Legacy Partners, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trail Blazers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Antonio Spurs, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Basketball Investors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Bullets, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?