McBrien v. United States
Plaintiff: Karen McBrien
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 3:2011cv05605
Filed: November 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH CIVIL STANDING ORDER AND CIVIL LOCAL RULES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/21/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER (mailed to Plaintiff). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/10/12. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/22/11. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McBrien v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen McBrien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?