Maryland Casualty Company v. Avalon Management LLC et al
Plaintiff: Maryland Casualty Company
Defendant: Super 8 Motels, LTD, Antoine Davillier, Avalon Management LLC, Tiburon Hospitality LLC, Tiburon Capital LLC, Tiburon Barstow LLC, Accor Franchising North America, LLC, Accor Business and Leisure Management LLC, Motel 6 Operating L.P., Accor Limited Partnership and Accor Management LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv05640
Filed: November 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND MOTION RE: FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, VACATING DEFAULT AS AGAINST DEFENDANT AVALON MANAGEMENT, LLC; ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, COUNTERCLAIMS, AND COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 120 Stipulation. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 SECOND ORDER re Attendance at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/23/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Re Attendance at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/22/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DEADLINES; SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING RE SETTLEMENT re 93 Joint Notice of Settlement and REQUEST to Take Pending Discovery Motions Off Calendar and REQUEST the hearing date for dispos itive motions be continued from April 23, 2013 to May 14, 2013 filed by Maryland Casualty Company. Discovery due by 3/14/2013. Dispositive Motions heard by 5/14/2013. Compliance Hearing is set for 3/22/2013 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/1/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Vacating February 28, 2013 Discovery Hearing. Motions terminated: 84 MOTION for Protective Order to Prohibit the Law Firm of Burnham Brown from deposing anyone from Avalon Managment LLC including Mark Grotewohl filed by Avalon Management LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/27/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER re 90 , 91 Discovery Letter Briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/26/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 82 . AMENDED ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion, ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing on 80 Discovery Letter Brief Joint Letter Brief: Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2013 11:00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/12/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying 59 Motion to Strike Improper Objections and/or Enter Judgment in Accordance with Stipulation. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Vacating January 24, 2013 Compliance Hearing, Motions terminated: 73 MOTION for Compliance Hearing and/or Order on Document Production filed by Tiburon Barstow LLC, Tiburon Capital LLC, Tiburon Hospitality LLC, 75 MOTION to Vacate Hearing Date Upon Filing Statement of Compliance with Agreement to Produce Policy filed by Maryland Casualty Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/24/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER re January 24, 2013 Compliance Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/23/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DIRECTING LEAD COUNSEL TO APPEAR IN PERSON TO MEET AND CONFER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/30/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: 53 STIPULATION TO VACATE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND ENTER PARTIAL JUDGMENT. Motions due by 11/7/2012. Replies due by 11/28/2012. Responses due by 11/21/2012. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/18/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012).
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge GONZALEZ ROGERS granting 48 Motion to Intervene (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/25/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 31 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Tiburon Capital LLC, 27 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Accor Franchising North America, LLC, 29 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Accor Management LLC, 32 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Tiburon Hospitality LLC, 30 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Tiburon Barstow LLC, 28 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Accor Limited Partnership. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/22/2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maryland Casualty Company v. Avalon Management LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super 8 Motels, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoine Davillier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avalon Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiburon Hospitality LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiburon Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiburon Barstow LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accor Franchising North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accor Business and Leisure Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motel 6 Operating L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accor Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accor Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryland Casualty Company
Represented By: Dean B. Herman
Represented By: Lilian Mazian Khanjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?