Luong et al v. City and County of San Francisco Police Department
Plaintiff: Vicky Luong, Rocky Luong and Kimberly Luong
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco Police Department
Case Number: 3:2011cv05661
Filed: November 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 86 Motion for New Trial (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/16/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' RULE 50 MOTION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/28/13. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REFRESHMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/28/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER RE FIRST AMENDMENT CLAIM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/22/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/21/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Summary Judgment (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re 30 Brief,, filed by Rocky Luong, Vicky Luong, Kimberly Luong. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/13/2012. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/15/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 19 Stipulation to file second amended complaint (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 5 STIPULATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/13/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luong et al v. City and County of San Francisco Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Luong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Luong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Luong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco Police Department
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?