Service Employees International Union National Industry Pension Fund et al v. U.S. Metro Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stephen Abrecht, Roderick S. Bashir, Kevin J. Doyle, David A. Stilwell, Steven W. Ford, Larry T. Smith, Frank A. Maxson, Edward Manko, John J. Sheridan, Myriam Escamilla and Service Employees International Union National Industry Pension Fund
Defendant: U.S. Metro Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv05711
Filed: November 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1451
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 38 Stipulation and Request to vacate settlement confereence, pretrial and trial dates and related deadlines. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re 30 Proposed Order Requesting Telephone Appearance at CMC filed by U.S. Metro Group, Inc.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/27/2012. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED ORDER CORRECTING DATE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/1/2012. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 26 Stipulation to continue Case Management Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/27/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 20 Motion to extend deadline for mediation. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 17 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 15 Stipulation selecting Mediation (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012) Modified on 4/30/2012 (rmm2, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/6/12. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Service Employees International Union National Industry Pension Fund et al v. U.S. Metro Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Abrecht
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick S. Bashir
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin J. Doyle
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Stilwell
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven W. Ford
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Hancock
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry T. Smith
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Hancock
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank A. Maxson
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Hancock
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Manko
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Hancock
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Sheridan
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Hancock
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myriam Escamilla
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Hancock
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Service Employees International Union National Industry Pension Fund
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Metro Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?