Felarca et al v. Birgeneau et al
Plaintiff: Yvette Felarca, Joshua Anderson, Christopher Anderson, James Chang, Hillary Chesler, Honest Chung, Morgan Crawford, Yania Escobar, Joseph Finton, Hayden Harrison, Louis Helm, Jacquelyn Kingkade, Maria Lewis, Benjamin Lynch, Ariella Megory, Liana Mulholland, Ashley Pinkerton, Jessica Schaffer, Colleen Mica Stumpf, Justin Tombolesi, Erick Uribe, Dan Wilbur, Colleen Young and Margaret Zhou
Defendant: Robert J. Birgeneau, George Breslauer, Harry Legrande, Linda Williams, John Wilton, Claire Holmes, Mitchell Celaya, Gregory Ahern, Howard A. Jordan, Chavez, Garcia, King, Lachler, Obichere and Roma
Case Number: 3:2011cv05719
Filed: November 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 561 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 525 Stipulation re Stay of Action Pending Resolution of Appeals; Setting Status Hearing. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER: AMENDMENT TO JANUARY 27, 2016 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/24/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' ATTORNEY RONALD T. CRUZ. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/3/2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 513 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1 RE: TRIAL SETTING AND INITIAL MOTIONS. Exhibit List due by 3/14/2016. Joint Exhibit list due 4/11/2016. Witness List and Expert Witness List due by 4/8/2016. Daubert motions filed by 4/26/2016. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/27/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER RE: FAILURE TO PAY SANCTIONS AND STRIKING OVER-LIMIT PAGES OF BRIEF. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/11/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO PAY SANCTIONS. Plaintiffs' counsel is sanctioned in the amount of $200.00 for this most recent violation of the Court's rules. Payment shall be made to the Court no later than September 4, 2015. Compliance hearing re payment is set 9/11/15 at 9:01am. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/19/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH DEADLINES. Show Cause Response due by 9:00 AM on Friday, 8/14/2015. The Court will notify Plaintiffs by separate notice if any hearing is required. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/11/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A ONE DAY EXTENSION AS MOOT re 450 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (One-Day Extension) filed by Anthony Morreale, Maximilian McDonald, Taro Yamaguchi-Phillips, Yania Escobar, Joseph Finton, Honest Chung, Benjamin Lynch, Liana Mulholland, Jacquelyn Kingkade, Colleen Young, Sachinthya Wagaarachchi, Colleen Mica Stumpf, Justin Tombolesi, Morgan Crawford, Louis Helm, Julie Klinger, Erick Uribe, Francisco Alvarado-Rosas, Joshua Anderson, Yvette Felarca, Christopher Anderson. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH DEADLINES. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Wednesday, 7/29/2015 10:00 AM. Should Plaintiffs file their Rep ly and Opposition on Motions for Summary Judgment On Issues of Excessive Force and False Arrest no later than 9:00am on 7/27/2015 the Court will vacate the Order to show Cause Hearing. If not filed by that time: Show Cause Response due no later than 9:00AM on 7/27/2015. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/23/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 427 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER DIRECTING IN CAMERA SUBMISSION AND BRIEFING ON ISSUE OF PLAINTIFFS' REPRESENTATION BY RONALD CRUZ. Signed by Judge Gonzalez Rogers on 5/12/2015. (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 388 DISREGARD ENTRY. ORDER DOCKETED IN INCORRECT CASE NUMBER ORDER STAYING DEADLINES, SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. The 5/11/15 CMC date is vacated. A Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 6/19/2015 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/28/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2015) Modified on 4/28/2015 (fs, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding personal attendance at the 2/27/2015 Further Settlement Conference. The parties may submit motions for administrative relief on or before 2/25/2014 in accordance with this order. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/23/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER RE: Docket No. 345 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/23/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER VACATING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; MODIFYING PRETRIAL DATES. The Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2015 is VACATED. Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2015 is ADVANCED to Friday, 6/5/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oa kland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing set for 6/5/2015 is ADVANCED to Friday, 5/15/2015 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement filing deadline of 6/12/2015 is ADVANCED to 5/22/2015. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/6/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re 350 Joinder, filed by Samantha Lachler, 349 MOTION for Leave to File MOTI ON for Reconsideration re 348 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Harry Legrande, Tucker, George Breslauer, Mitchell Celaya, Linda Williams, Marc DeCoulode, Eric Tejada, Robert J. Birgeneau, Claire Holmes, 351 Joinder, filed by Buckhout, Buschhueter, Wilson, Obichere, Garcia, Armijo, Rodrigues. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/2/2015. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2015)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 264 Motion to Dismiss; granting 282 Motion to Dismiss; granting 283 Motion to Dismiss; granting 285 Motion to Dismiss; denying 287 Motion for Leave to Amend; granting 302 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND ALAMEDA COUNTY SHERIFF'SOFFICE. Plaintiffs and ACSO shall meet and confer regarding the disputes raised in Docket No. 340, and shall file a joint discovery letter by December 18, 2014 if they are unable to resolve those disputes without judicial intervention. Motions terminated: 342 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/10/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER DENYING EX PARTEDISCOVERY LETTERS 338 339 340 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/9/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER. The undersigned has reviewed the order by Judge Gonzales Rogers denying the parties' request to extend the case management deadlines. 335 After conferring with Judge Gonzales Rogers, the undersigned orders the parties to immediately meet and confer regarding the deposition dates set forth in Docket No. 332 . All depositions must be completed by January 12, 2015. The parties shall file a letter indicating the rescheduled deposition dates by December 2, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/26/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014) Modified on 11/26/2014 (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 320 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Non-Expert Discovery (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 319 AMENDED ORDER Setting TELEPHONIC Hearing on Motion 314 Discovery Letter Brief re Unresolved Discovery Issues (Re-filing of Document 313) : TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/27/14.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014) Modified on 10/28/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER RE: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE DISCOVERY LETTER 314 . Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendants' letter by October 21, 2014. Any response shall not exceed three pages.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/19/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2014)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 305 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 304 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 286 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 221 Motion to Dismiss; granting 224 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 232 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 9/26/14 Settlement Conference;denying without prejudice 233 , 236 , 237 , 248 Motions for Administrative Relief to Excuse Personal Attendance at 9/26/14 Settlement Conference. The parties may submit a new motion for administrative relief on or before 9/17/2014 in accordance with this order. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 227 NOTICE OF AMENDED DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/11/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting as modified 215 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/07/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER AND ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET MARCH 10, 2014. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ryu for Discovery purposes. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Westmore for Settlement Conference to be completed by 9/30/14. Amended Pleadings due by 5/16/2014. Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2014. Non-Expert Discovery due by 11/28/2014. Joinder of Parties due by 5/16/2014. Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2014 02:00 PM in Cou rtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Selection set for 7/20/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 5 Day Jury Trial set for 7/20/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzal ez Rogers. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for Tuesday, 6/26/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing set for Friday, 6/5/2015 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/6/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 162 Motion to Dismiss AS TO DEFENDANT ERIC TEJADA (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 121 Motion of Defendants Officer Chavez, Officer Garcia, Officer King and Officer Obichere to Dismiss Count Three of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. The Court VACATES the hearing on this Motion set for September 10, 2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs' Failure to Repsond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/9/2013. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2013 is CONTINUED to Monday, 10/21/13 at 2:00pm. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/31/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers withdrawing 104 Motion for Leave to File; granting 105 Motion for Leave to File; granting 107 Motion to Withdraw (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER ENTERING TENTATIVE RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AS ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion to Dismiss; terminating 52 Motion to Dismiss; granting 57 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion to Dismiss.The February 26, 2013 hearing on the Motions is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 TENTATIVE ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. No later than 2:00pm on Monday, 2/25/2013 the parties shall file a Joint Statement as stated in this Order Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/22/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND [MODIFIED] ORDER TO REVISE CASE SCHEDULE as to 50 Motion to Dismiss, 57 Motion to Dismiss, 58 Motion to Dismiss, 52 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 11/13/2012. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Case Management Conference 2/11/13. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/31/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND[ MODIFIED] ORDER TO REVISE CASE SCHEDULE, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 50 MOTION to Dismiss, 57 MOTION to Dismiss, 58 MOTION to Dismiss, 52 MOTION to Dismiss. Replies due by 11/13/2012. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Case Management Conference 2/11/13.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/31/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 65 to Revise Case Schedule filed by Anthony Morreale, Rick Florendo, Harry Legrande, Yania Escobar, Ashley Pinkerton, Joseph Finton, Hayden Harrison, George Breslauer, Garcia, Liana Mulholland, Jacquelyn Kingka de, Sachinthya Wagaarachchi, Colleen Young, Jessica Schaffer, Colleen Mica Stumpf, Justin Tombolesi, Hillary Chesler, Samantha Lachler, Obichere, Julie Klinger, Mitchell Celaya, Francisco Alvarado-Rosas, Robert J. Birgeneau, Maximilian Mc Donald, Taro Yamaguchi-Phillips, King, Honest Chung, Benjamin Lynch, Linda Williams, Chavez, Claire Holmes, Dan Wilbur, John Wilton, Morgan Crawford, Louis Helm, Margaret Zhou, Gregory Ahern, James Chang, Erick Uribe, N. Hernandez, Maria Lewis, Ariella Megory, Joshua Anderson, Christopher Anderson, Yvette Felarca, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Revise Case Schedule, 50 MOTION to Dismiss, 57 MOTION to Dismiss, 58 MOTION t o Dismiss, 52 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/23/2012. Replies due by 11/6/2012. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge GONZALEZ ROGERS on 10/17/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FOR SAMANTHA LACHLER re 41 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Lachler. Attorney Russell M. Perry is counsel of record and Attorney Janine Laura Scancarelli terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/14/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Initial Case Management Conference is CONTINUED from July 30, 2012 to Monday, 9/10/2012 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/26/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felarca et al v. Birgeneau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Felarca
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Anderson
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Anderson
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Chang
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillary Chesler
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honest Chung
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Crawford
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yania Escobar
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Finton
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayden Harrison
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Helm
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Kingkade
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Lewis
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Lynch
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariella Megory
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liana Mulholland
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Pinkerton
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Schaffer
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Mica Stumpf
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Tombolesi
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Uribe
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Wilbur
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Young
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Zhou
Represented By: Ronald T Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Birgeneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Breslauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Legrande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claire Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Celaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard A. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lachler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obichere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?