Meadows v. First American Trustee Servicing Solutions, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Randy Meadows
Defendant: First American Trustee Servicing Solutions, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank and Bank of America
Case Number: 3:2011cv05754
Filed: November 30, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/28/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
June 26, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 8/16/2013 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/26/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 21, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/8/2013 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 7/1/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2013 is CONTINUED to 7/8/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/21/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
September 10, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
August 31, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING. The Motion Hearing previously set for September 4, 2012 is VACATED. The Court will issue a written decision on the papers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/31/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
May 11, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING NON-MONETARY STATUS OF DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLUTIONS, LLC re 39 Proposed Order filed by First American Trustee Servicing Solutions, LLC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/11/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 7, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/7/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
March 1, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. James Ware. Hon. Thelton E. Henderson no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/1/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
February 29, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton Henderson on 2/29/12. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 23, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Selecting ADR Process. Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/23/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
December 28, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Hon. Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/28/11. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2011)
December 21, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court RECUSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/21/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
December 20, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CHANGING TIME PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-2. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/20/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 15, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 12/29/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/15/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
November 30, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 2 Temporary Restraining Order and setting preliminary injunction hearing. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/30/2011. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meadows v. First American Trustee Servicing Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Meadows
Represented By: Keith Ogden
Represented By: Robert F. Kane
Represented By: Shirley Hochhausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Trustee Servicing Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Glenn Harlan Wechsler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: M. Elizabeth Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: M. Elizabeth Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?