Macy's Inc. et al v. Strategic Marks, LLC Featured Case
Plaintiff: Macy's Inc. and Macys.com, Inc.
Defendant: Strategic Marks, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv06198
Filed: December 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2012 Filing 37 Plaintiffs Macy's, Inc. and Macys.com, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant Strategic Marks, LLC byMacy's Inc., Macys.com, Inc.. (Walters, Christopher) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 20, 2012 Filing 36 Certificate of Interested Entities by Strategic Marks, LLC (Anand, Ashwin) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
April 19, 2012 Filing 35 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Anand, Ashwin) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
April 17, 2012 Filing 34 CLERKS NOTICE: Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment and Defendants Motion to Set Aside the Default set for hearing on Friday, April 20, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. before the Honorable Samuel Conti are submitted for a decision on the pleadings. Parties are hereby informed that there will be no appearance and no oral argument on these matters. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 17, 2012 Filing 33 REPLY (re 24 MOTION to Set Aside Default ) filed byStrategic Marks, LLC. (Anand, Ashwin) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 13, 2012 Filing 32 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Filed by Plaintiffs (Walters, Christopher) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 13, 2012 Filing 31 Declaration of Frank Harrigan in Support of 29 Opposition/Response to Motion to Set Aside Default filed byMacy's Inc., Macys.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Walters, Christopher) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 13, 2012 Filing 30 Declaration of Christopher S. Walters in Support of 29 Opposition/Response to Motion to Defendant Strategic Marks, LLC's Motion to Set Aside Default filed byMacy's Inc., Macys.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - I)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Walters, Christopher) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 13, 2012 Filing 29 RESPONSE (re 24 MOTION to Set Aside Default ) filed byMacy's Inc., Macys.com, Inc.. (Walters, Christopher) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 11, 2012 Filing 28 REPLY (re 20 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Strategic Marks, LLC ) filed byMacy's Inc., Macys.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher S. Walters in Support of Plaintiffs Macy's, Inc. and Macys.Com, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for Default Judgment)(Walters, Christopher) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
April 5, 2012 Filing 27 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 25 Motion to Shorten Time.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 4, 2012 Filing 26 RESPONSE (re 20 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Strategic Marks, LLC ) filed byStrategic Marks, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Anand, Ashwin) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
April 4, 2012 Filing 25 MOTION to Shorten Time on Motion to Set Aside Default filed by Strategic Marks, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Anand, Ashwin) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
April 4, 2012 Filing 24 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Strategic Marks, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 4/18/2012. Replies due by 4/25/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Anand, Ashwin) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
March 28, 2012 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs byStrategic Marks, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Anand, Ashwin) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 6, 2012 Filing 22 Proposed Order re 20 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Strategic Marks, LLC by Macy's Inc., Macys.com, Inc.. (Walters, Christopher) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
March 6, 2012 Filing 21 Declaration in Support of 20 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Strategic Marks, LLC filed byMacy's Inc., Macys.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 7)(Related document(s) 20 ) (Walters, Christopher) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
March 6, 2012 Filing 20 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant Strategic Marks, LLC filed by Macy's Inc., Macys.com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 3/20/2012. Replies due by 3/27/2012. (Walters, Christopher) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 19 Clerks Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Strategic Marks, LLC. All parties noticed via e-mail or U.S. mail. (Related documents(s) 18 )(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 27, 2012 Filing 18 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Macy's Inc., Macys.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher S. Walters, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Walters, Christopher) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
February 15, 2012 Filing 17 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2012)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Samuel Conti for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/24/12. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 24, 2012 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 23, 2012 Filing 14 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Macy's Inc., Macys.com, Inc. . (Walters, Christopher) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
December 22, 2011 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Macy's Inc., Macys.com, Inc.. Strategic Marks, LLC served on 12/20/2011, answer due 1/10/2012. (Weng, Garner) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 13, 2011 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Jessica Capasso leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611068059.) filed by Macy's Inc., Macys.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Chester Rothstein leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611068061.) filed by Macy's Inc., Macys.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Holly Pekowsky leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611068058.) filed by Macy's Inc., Macys.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 12, 2011 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Anthony F. Lo Cicero leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611068056.) filed by Macy's Inc., Macys.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/19/2012. Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/9/11. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
December 9, 2011 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Macy's Inc., Macys.com, Inc. re 1 Complaint, (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
December 9, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /issued summons against Strategic Marks, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611067988.). Filed byMacy's Inc., Macys.com, Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2011: # 1 Summons, # 2 Complaint) (ga, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macy's Inc. et al v. Strategic Marks, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Macy's Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Capasso
Represented By: Anthony Francis Lo Cicero
Represented By: Holly Pekowsky
Represented By: Chester Rothstein
Represented By: Christopher S Walters
Represented By: Garner Kimleon Weng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Macys.com, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Capasso
Represented By: Anthony Francis Lo Cicero
Represented By: Holly Pekowsky
Represented By: Chester Rothstein
Represented By: Christopher S Walters
Represented By: Garner Kimleon Weng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Marks, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?