Knight v. Aqui et al
Plaintiff: William E. Knight
Defendant: Diane Aqui, Mark D. Jordan and Estate of Mark D. Jordan
Case Number: 3:2011cv06337
Filed: December 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 76 Stipulation filed by William E. Knight, Diane Aqui. Status Conference set for 2/5/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 8, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 AMENDED FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 29, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 28, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REQUIRING PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND STRIKING DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF re 26 Letter filed by William E. Knight. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/28/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING; AND REQUIRING PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER TO RESOLVE DISCOVERY ISSUES. Compliance Hearing set for 9/21/2011 is CONTINUED TO Friday, 10/5/2012 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/19/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING Order to Show Cause Hearing/Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 9/21/2012 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 9/17/2012. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/12/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/23/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight v. Aqui et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E. Knight
Represented By: Jerome M. Garchik
Represented By: Michael Byron Cohen
Represented By: Bruce Edward Krell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Aqui
Represented By: Russell Samuel Roeca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark D. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Mark D. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?