Purvis v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie B. Purvis
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Trans Union LLC and Experian Information Solutions Inc
Case Number: 3:2011cv06352
Filed: December 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/07/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE DISCOVERY CUT-OFF re 74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Discovery cutoff: 1/31/2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/21/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/2/2014 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2014 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 5/12/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 5/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/7/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY CASE SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/27/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER REGARDING MOTION TO COMPEL (Dkt. No. 48). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/9/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDER DISPUTE (Dkt. Nos. 35, 41.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/31/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER REGARDING A PROTECTIVE ORDER (DKT. NO. 35). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/21/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/18/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Case referred to mediation. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2013 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2013 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 7/22/2013 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 7/22/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/19/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purvis v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Stephanie D. Cope
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Schuckit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Angela M. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie B. Purvis
Represented By: Robert S. Sola
Represented By: Mark F. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?