Aria Diagnostics, Inc v. Sequenom, Inc

Plaintiff: Aria Diagnostics, Inc
Defendant: Sequenom, Inc
Case Number: 3:2011cv06391
Filed: December 19, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2014 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 272 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
November 5, 2013 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 11/6/13 is continued to 11/13/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/5/13. Motions terminated: (143 in 3:12-cv-00865-SI) STIPULATION WI TH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Verinata Health, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, (257 in 3:11-cv-06391-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER R egarding Schedule For Further Case Management Statement filed by Sequenom, Inc, (139 in 3:12-cv-00132-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Schedule For Further Case Management Statement filed by Sequenom, Inc, (96 in 3:12-c v-05501-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Verinata Health, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
October 30, 2013 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 219 223 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 23, 2013 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, GRANTING: 248 MOTION to Continue Sequenom's Unopposed Administrative Motion To Continue Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date On Sequenom's Motion For A Preliminary Injunction filed by Sequenom, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/22/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 22, 2013 249 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: (91 in 3:12-cv-05501-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Verinata Health, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior Unive rsity, (136 in 3:12-cv-00865-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Verinata Health, Inc., The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/21/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 16, 2013 246 Opinion or Order of the Court CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
September 23, 2013 237 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 225 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 16, 2013 236 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA for the Federal Circuit Judgment re 123 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit: VACATED and REMANDED. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
July 21, 2013 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL 97 in case 3:12-cv-00865-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/21/2013)
July 10, 2013 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 201 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
June 11, 2013 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO CLARIFY OR MODIFY PROTECTIVE ORDER 175 193 in case 3:11-cv-06391-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
February 25, 2013 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE LETTER BRIEFS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
August 28, 2012 141 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CHANGE ADR SCHEDULE re 140 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Change ADR Schedule filed by Ariosa Diagnostics, Inc. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on August 28, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
July 5, 2012 121 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER 34 115 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
June 13, 2012 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON APPLICATION TO SEAL 104 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 11, 2012 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed on 6/11/12 by Judge Illston, 102 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 88 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,, 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction JOINT STIPULATION AND [ PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE ON SEQUENOM filed by Aria Diagnostics, Inc. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/11/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
May 29, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON APPLICATION TO SEAL 71 82 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 17, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SEALING (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 7, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed on 5/4/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting 63 Motion for Extension of Time to File. ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant Ariosa's Motion To Enlarge Time is GRANTED. The deadline to file Ariosa's Opposition to Sequenom's Preliminary Injunction Motion is hereby continued from May 11, 2012 until May 15, 2012. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
April 13, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston signed on 4/12/12granting 61 Stipulation for Protective Order (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012) Modified on 4/13/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Illton granting 54 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
March 21, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Expedited Discovery And Amended Schedule For Hearing On Preliminary Injunction filed by Sequenom, Inc, 43 Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Expedited Discovery An d Briefing Schedule For Preliminary Injunction Motion filed by Aria Diagnostics, Inc. Replies due by 6/1/2012. Responses due by 5/11/2012. Motion hearing set 6/15/12 @ 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom #10 before Judge Illston. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/20/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 7, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
January 30, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aria Diagnostics, Inc v. Sequenom, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequenom, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aria Diagnostics, Inc
Represented By: David Isaac Gindler
Represented By: Andrei Iancu
Represented By: Amir Aghazadeh Naini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?