Buckner v. Covenant Aviation Security, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tanisha Buckner
Defendant: Covenant Aviation Security, LLC, Pamela Pierson, Lavon Smith, Larry Perkins, Shelly Berrell and Joseph Scott
Case Number: 3:2011cv06394
Filed: December 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/10/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER VACATING PENDING DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/8/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/1/2012 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 2/16/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/2/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/27/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckner v. Covenant Aviation Security, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanisha Buckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covenant Aviation Security, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Alan Schwachter
Represented By: Galen Matthew Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Pierson
Represented By: Joseph Alan Schwachter
Represented By: Galen Matthew Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lavon Smith
Represented By: Joseph Alan Schwachter
Represented By: Galen Matthew Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Perkins
Represented By: Galen Matthew Lichtenstein
Represented By: Joseph Alan Schwachter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Berrell
Represented By: Galen Matthew Lichtenstein
Represented By: Joseph Alan Schwachter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Scott
Represented By: Galen Matthew Lichtenstein
Represented By: Joseph Alan Schwachter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?