Frustere v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Richard A. Frustere
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Brendan Murphy
Case Number: 3:2011cv06395
Filed: December 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FILED JUNE 22, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 25, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S 84 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The above-titled action is dismissed with prejudice and defendant is awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $2037. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 21, 2013. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 AMENDED ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The sole amendment is to change the figure at line 22 on page 2. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 24, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT BRENDAN MURPHY WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 12, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE. The deadline to complete mediation is extended by 90 days. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 24, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff's Second Cause of Action ("Intentional Misrepresentation") is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff's Eighth Cause of Action ("Negligence") is dismissed without leave to amend. Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, if any, shall be filed no later than August 17, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 13, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/25/12. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The hearing scheduled for April 20, 2012 is vacated. Frustere's Second Amended Complaint, if any, shall be filed no later than May 9, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 18, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the pending Motion to Dismiss, the Case Management Conference currently scheduled for April 6, 2012 is continued to May 25, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 29, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 23, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO ALLOW FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Good cause appearing, the Court orders that plaintiff be allowed to file the attached First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file his first amended complaint no later than three court days from the filing of this order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 14, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The Court deems the matter submitted on the moving papers and vacates the hearing scheduled for February 24, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 8, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frustere v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Frustere
Represented By: Mary Catherine Wiederhold
Represented By: William Edward Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Mark Joseph Kenney
Represented By: Jason Matthew Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?