Meier et al v. Bozora et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Meier, Hazelle Fortich and The Meier Fortich Family Trust UDT
Defendant: Michael W. Bozora, True North Financing Corporation, Capital Solutions Monthly Income Fund, Capital Solutions, LLC, Capital Solutions Management, LP, Ted Ammiro and Ammiro Mortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv06609
Filed: December 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This matter is dismissed without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/01/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED, requiring plaintiff to move for entry of default judgment or otherwise show cause why case should not be dismissed. (wholc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re 56 Order to Show Cause. The entry of default against Bozora, Dkt. No. 54 , shall remain in effect. The hearing on the order to show cause set for January 13, 2015 is VACATED. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/07/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFAULT SHOULD NOT BE SET ASIDE AND WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED - Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/13/2015 03:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 1/6/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/12/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED - If plaintiffs attempt to show good cause, they shall file a Memorandum in Response to Order to Show Cause on or before August 26, 2014 with a supporting declaration, and shall attend the Case Management Conference calendar on September 2, 2014 at 2 p.m. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/03/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING HEARING ON ANTICIPATED MOTION TO STAY. Motions to Stay due by 6/15/2012. Responses due by 6/29/2012. Replies due by 7/3/2012. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Judge James Ware. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on June 11, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meier et al v. Bozora et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Meier
Represented By: George Frost
Represented By: Alexander Volchegursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazelle Fortich
Represented By: George Frost
Represented By: Alexander Volchegursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Meier Fortich Family Trust UDT
Represented By: George Frost
Represented By: Alexander Volchegursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W. Bozora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: True North Financing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Solutions Monthly Income Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Solutions Management, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Ammiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ammiro Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?