Oiyemhonlan et al v. Chase Bank et al
Plaintiff: Joseph O. Oiyemhonlan and Martha Oiyemhonlan
Defendant: Chase Bank and Quality Loan Service Corp.
Case Number: 3:2011cv06622
Filed: December 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 5/14/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER OF CONDISTIONAL DISMISSAL re 31 Notice of Settlement (Other) filed by Chase Bank, Quality Loan Service Corp., ***Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 5/21/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 5/3/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting re 24 First Amended Request for Continuance of Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/25/2012. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re 20 MOTION to Continue filed by Joseph O. Oiyemhonlan. Signed by Judge Laporte on 4/23/12. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Modify Prior Order on Stay of Proceeding for Sixty Days and [Proposed] Order filed by Chase Bank, Quality Loan Service Corp. Responses due by 4/2/2012.Replies due by 4/9/2012. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 3/29/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS FOR SIXTY DAYS AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Chase Bank, Quality Loan Service Corp. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 1/23/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oiyemhonlan et al v. Chase Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank
Represented By: Yvonne Penas Greer
Represented By: Charles Scott Greene
Represented By: Sean David Muntz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp.
Represented By: Yvonne Penas Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph O. Oiyemhonlan
Represented By: Lyle W. Johnson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Oiyemhonlan
Represented By: Lyle W. Johnson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?