Vasudevan Software, Inc. v. MicroStrategy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vasudevan Software, Inc.
Defendant: MicroStrategy, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv06637
Filed: December 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/19/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 338 Joint Stipulation and Order of Non-Infringement. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/21/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/17/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER REGARDING PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/9/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013) Modified on 10/10/2013 (cl, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/4/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 326 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CLARIFICATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/19/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 272 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO VSI'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/5/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/2/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeeborg on 7/18/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 245 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 244 REQUESTING PRETRIAL MOTION HEARING DATE AND RELATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/2/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/18/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 201 STIPULATION AND ORDER Requesting Dispositive Motion Hearing Date and Related Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/11/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 171 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 186 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO COMPEL re 170 MOTION to Compel MicroStrategy Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery and for in Camera Review filed by MicroStrategy, Inc.. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 3, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 76 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 164 REQUESTING EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY CUTOFF PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-2. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/14/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY CUTOFF PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-2. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/22/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 147 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 146 REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND AND REPLY TO PLAINTIFF VSI'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND FURTHER REQUESTING CHANGE OF DATE TO HEAR MOTION. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/17/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2013 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2013 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 11/18/2013 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 11/18/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/16/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 96 Motion to Compel; granting 96 Motion for Discovery; deferring ruling on 99 Motion for Protective Order; deferring ruling on 104 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 106 Motion to Compel (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/13/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 126 CHANGING TIME FOR HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/1/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/19/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 69 EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/18/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 65 REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR BOTH PARTIES TO EXCHANGE PRELIMINARY CLAIM CONSTRUCTIONS AND EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/16/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Claims Construction Hearing set for 9/12/2012 10:00 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 9/12/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/27/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/5/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasudevan Software, Inc. v. MicroStrategy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vasudevan Software, Inc.
Represented By: Eric James Enger
Represented By: Michael F. Heim
Represented By: Stephen Edward Morrissey
Represented By: Nick P. Patel
Represented By: Leslie V. Payne
Represented By: Nabeel Hanif Peracha
Represented By: Brooke Ashley-May Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MicroStrategy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?