Vasudevan Software, Inc. v. TIBCO Software, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vasudevan Software, Inc.
Defendant: TIBCO Software, Inc. and Spotfire Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv06638
Filed: December 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 STIPULATION AND ORDER and Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/13/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 244 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/24/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/17/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER REGARDING PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/9/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER RE PAGE LIMITATIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/26/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/18/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 STIPULATION AND ORDER REQUESTING EXTENSION OF PRETRIAL MOTION DEADLINES PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-2. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/21/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER RE 133 GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING CERTAIN EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/6/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 129 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 127 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,167,864 for Lack of Written Description and Enablement (Public Redacted Version) filed by TIBCO Software, Inc., Vasudevan Software, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 129 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 127 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,167,864 for Lack of Written Description and Enablement (Public Redacted Version) , 127 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,167,864 for Lack of Written Description and Enablement (Public Redacted Version). Responses due by 4/25/2013. Replies due by 5/9/2013. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/2/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REQUESTING EXTENSION OF EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINES PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-2. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/26/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2014 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 1/27/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 1/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/1/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/17/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 77 REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR BOTH PARTIES TO EXCHANGE PRELIMINARY CLAIM CONSTRUCTIONS AND EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/16/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Claims Construction Hearing set for 9/12/2012 10:00 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 9/12/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/27/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/4/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF SPOTFIRE, INC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/22/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasudevan Software, Inc. v. TIBCO Software, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vasudevan Software, Inc.
Represented By: Eric James Enger
Represented By: Michael F. Heim
Represented By: Stephen Edward Morrissey
Represented By: Niraj Patel
Represented By: Leslie V Payne
Represented By: Nabeel Hanif Peracha
Represented By: Brooke Ashley-May Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIBCO Software, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spotfire Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?