In re Apple iPhone Antitrust Litigation Featured Case
Plaintiff: Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Edward W. Hayter and Harry Bass
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv06714
Filed: December 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2018 Filing 134 NOTICE of filing to provide the Court with an update regarding Apples petition for a writ of certiorari to the Supreme Court by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 5/9/2018) Modified on 5/9/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2017 Filing 133 USCA Case Number 17-204 US Supreme Court. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
May 12, 2017 Filing 132 MANDATE of USCA as to 127 Notice of Appeal, filed by Stephen H. Schwartz, Robert Pepper, Eric Terrell, Edward W. Hayter (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
January 12, 2017 Filing 131 Opinion of USCA as to 127 Notice of Appeal, filed by Stephen H. Schwartz, Robert Pepper, Eric Terrell, Edward W. Hayter. REVERSED AND REMANDED. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017) Modified on 1/13/2017 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2014 Filing 130 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 11/05/13, 03/05/13, 12/10/12, 06/18/12 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez-Rogers, James Ware, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 7, 2014 Filing 129 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/7/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 2, 2014 Filing 128 USCA Case Number 14-15000 for 127 Notice of Appeal, filed by Stephen H. Schwartz, Robert Pepper, Eric Terrell, Edward W. Hayter. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
December 31, 2013 Filing 127 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss 124 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-8263870 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 12/31/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 126 Proposed Judgment by Apple Inc. (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 12/30/2013) Modified on 12/31/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2013 Filing 125 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 115 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with Prejudice. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 25, 2013 Filing 123 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 5, 2013, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-451-7530, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/24/2014. (Related document(s) 122 ) (rhm) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 7, 2013 Filing 122 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
November 7, 2013 Filing 121 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held and submitted on 11/5/2013 before Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 11/7/2013) re 115 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/7/2013)
October 30, 2013 Filing 120 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2013 is CONTINUED to Monday, 12/16/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 119 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc., Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 10/28/2013) Modified on 10/29/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2013 Filing 118 REPLY (re 115 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint ) filed byApple Inc.. (Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 21, 2013 Filing 117 CLERKS NOTICE CHANGING TIME OF HEARING ON NOVEMBER 5, 2013. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 115 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2013 WILL BE HELD AT 10:00 AM (Instead of at 2:00PM) in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 15, 2013 Filing 116 RESPONSE (re 115 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint ) Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Opposition to Defendant Apple's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Complaint filed byEdward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant Apple's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint)(Schmidt, Alexander) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
September 30, 2013 Filing 115 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 10/15/2013. Replies due by 10/22/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 112 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to 9/30/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 10, 2013 Filing 113 RESPONSE (re 112 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer ) filed byEdward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexander H. Schmidt In Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Administrative Motion To Enlarge Time To Respond To Second Amended Complaint)(Schmidt, Alexander) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 10, 2013 Filing 112 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sadik Huseny, # 2 Proposed Order)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 5, 2013 Filing 111 AMENDED COMPLAINT CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (SECOND); Jury Demand against Robert Pepper, Edward W. Hayter, Eric Terrell, Stephen H. Schwartz. Filed byRobert Pepper, Edward W. Hayter, Eric Terrell, Stephen H. Schwartz. (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 9/5/2013) Modified on 9/6/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers DENYING 109 Stipulation (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 28, 2013 Filing 109 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Apple Inc., Robert Pepper, et al. (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 8/28/2013) Modified on 8/29/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing per the 108 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Case Management Conference set for Monday, 11/4/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 88 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Complaint with Leave to Amend. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
April 3, 2013 Filing 107 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 5, 2013, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-451-7530, rayneeh@hotmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2013. (rhm) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
March 5, 2013 Filing 106 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held and submitted on 3/5/2013 before Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 3/5/2013) re 88 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Apple Inc.. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/5/2013)
January 24, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 88 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 104 Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 14, 2013 Filing 104 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Apple Inc., Robert Pepper, et al. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 1/14/2013) Modified on 1/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 88 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
January 7, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT APPLE'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT [Dkt. No. 88] Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2013 is VACATED AND RESET to Tuesday 2/12/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
December 21, 2012 Filing 103 REPLY (re 88 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byApple Inc.. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 18, 2012 Filing 102 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 10, 2012, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-451-7530, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov, rayneeh@hotmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/8/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2013. (rhm) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 17, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE : THE 12/17/12 AT 2:00PM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES IN CASE C-11-6714-YGR AND CASE C-12-5404-YGR ARE VACATED. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 10, 2012 Filing 101 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/10/2012 before Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 12/10/2012). Further Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/10/2012)
December 7, 2012 Filing 100 Declaration of Michael Liskow in Support of 99 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byHarry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 99 ) (Liskow, Michael) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
December 7, 2012 Filing 99 RESPONSE (re 88 MOTION to Dismiss ) PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT APPLES MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT filed byHarry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. (Schmidt, Alexander) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
December 6, 2012 Filing 98 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Amended) filed by Harry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell, Apple Inc. (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 12/6/2012) Modified on 12/7/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying (94) Stipulation in case 4:11-cv-06714-YGR; denying (8) Stipulation in case 4:12-cv-05404-YGR (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
December 3, 2012 Filing 96 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Harry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell, Apple Inc. (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 12/3/2012) Modified on 12/4/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2012 Filing 95 Declaration of RACHELE R. RICKERT in Support of 94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed byHarry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. (Related document(s) 94 ) (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 28, 2012 Filing 94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Harry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell, Apple Inc. (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 11/28/2012) Modified on 11/29/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 88 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 12/7/2012. Replies due by 12/21/2012. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 91 Stipulation Extending Briefing Schedule (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER RELATING CASES C-11-6714-YGR and C-12-5404-JCS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/15/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 14, 2012 Filing 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule on Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Complaint [ECF NO. 88] filed by Harry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell, Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachele R. Rickert in Support of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Briefing Schedule on Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Complaint [ECF NO. 88])(Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 11/14/2012) Modified on 11/15/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2012 Filing 90 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 87 MOTION to Relate Case (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
November 2, 2012 Filing 89 Request for Judicial Notice re 88 MOTION to Dismiss filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 88 ) (Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
November 2, 2012 Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss and [Proposed] Order filed by Apple Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 11/16/2012. Replies due by 11/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 11/2/2012) Modified on 11/5/2012 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2012 Filing 87 MOTION to Relate Case and [Proposed] Order filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 11/2/2012) Modified on 11/5/2012 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2012 Filing 86 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, filed by Apple Inc., Harry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 11/1/2012) Modified on 11/2/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2012 Filing 85 CORRECTED CLERKS NOTICE SETTING Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. [Corrected to reflect correct case number] (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 25, 2012 Filing 84 CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT re 82 Stipulation filed by Robert Pepper, Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/18/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
October 5, 2012 Filing 82 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Apple Inc., Robert Pepper. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 10/5/2012) Modified on 10/9/2012 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2012 Filing 81 AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; JURY TRIAL against Apple Inc.. Filed byCrystal Boykin, Robert Pepper, Edward W. Hayter, James Blackwell, Harry Bass, Eric Terrell, Stephen H. Schwartz. (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 9/28/2012) Modified on 10/1/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2012 Filing 80 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Harry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell, Apple Inc. (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 9/24/2012) Modified on 9/25/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REASSIGNMENT ORDER OF JUDGE YVONNE GONZALEZ ROGERS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/6/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. James Ware no longer assigned to the case. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFFS TIME TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT re 76 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on July 25, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 23, 2012 Filing 76 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Plaintiffs' Time To File An Amended Complaint filed by Harry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Rachele R. Rickert In Support Of Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Extending Plaintiffs' Time To File An Amended Complaint)(Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 11, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012).
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion to Dismiss; denying 48 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 66 Motion for Leave to File; denying 72 Motion for Leave to File (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 6, 2012 Filing 74 RESPONSE (re 72 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' L.R. 7-3 Motion For Persmission To File A Supplemental Brief On Apple Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss [ECF No. 37] And Motion to Compel Arbitration [ECF No. 48] ) filed byApple Inc.. (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 73 Declaration of Mark C. Rifkin in Support of 72 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' L.R. 7-3 Motion For Persmission To File A Supplemental Brief On Apple Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss [ECF No. 37] And Motion to Compel Arbitration [ECF No. 48] filed byHarry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. (Related document(s) 72 ) (Rifkin, Mark) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' L.R. 7-3 Motion For Persmission To File A Supplemental Brief On Apple Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss [ECF No. 37] And Motion to Compel Arbitration [ECF No. 48] filed by Harry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Civil L.R. 7-3 Motion For Permission To File A Supplemental Brief On Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 37] And Motion To Compel Arbitration [ECF No. 48])(Rifkin, Mark) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 21, 2012 Filing 71 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/18/12, before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2012. (jjy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 18, 2012 Filing 70 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/18/2012 before Chief Judge James Ware re 48 MOTION to Compel; and 37 MOTION to Dismiss. (Date Filed: 6/18/2012). (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/18/2012)
June 15, 2012 Filing 69 OBJECTIONS to re 67 Declaration in Support,, 62 Declaration in Support, in connection with Apple's Motion to Compel Arbitration by Apple Inc.. (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 12, 2012 Filing 68 RESPONSE (re 66 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Civil L.R. 7-3 Motion For Permission To File A Sur-Reply Brief On Apple Inc.'s Motion To Compel Arbitration [ECF No. 48] ) filed byApple Inc.. (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 67 Declaration of Mark C. Rifkin in Support of 66 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Civil L.R. 7-3 Motion For Permission To File A Sur-Reply Brief On Apple Inc.'s Motion To Compel Arbitration [ECF No. 48] Declaration of Mark C. Rifkin In Support of Plaintiffs' Civil L.R. 7-3 Motion For Permission To File A Sur-Reply Brief On Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration [ECF No. 48] filed byHarry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. (Related document(s) 66 ) (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Civil L.R. 7-3 Motion For Permission To File A Sur-Reply Brief On Apple Inc.'s Motion To Compel Arbitration [ECF No. 48] filed by Harry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Civil L.R. 7-3 Motion For Permission To File A Sur-Reply Brief On Apple Inc.'s Motion To Compel Arbitration [ECF No. 48])(Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 5, 2012 Filing 65 REPLY (re 48 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Claims ) filed byApple Inc.. (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
May 29, 2012 Filing 64 Declaration of Michael A. Williams, PH.D. in Support of 61 Opposition/Response to Motion Expert Declaration of Michael A. Williams, PH.D. filed byHarry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. (Related document(s) 61 ) (Rifkin, Mark) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 29, 2012 Filing 63 Declaration of Simon J. Wilkie, PH.D. in Support of 61 Opposition/Response to Motion Expert Declaration of Simon J. Wilkie, PH.D. filed byHarry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. (Related document(s) 61 ) (Rifkin, Mark) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 29, 2012 Filing 62 Declaration of Mark C. Rifkin in Support of 61 Opposition/Response to Motion Declaration of Mark C. Rifkin In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple's Motion to Compel Arbitration filed byHarry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. (Related document(s) 61 ) (Rifkin, Mark) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 29, 2012 Filing 61 RESPONSE (re 48 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Claims ) filed byHarry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. (Rifkin, Mark) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge May 23, 2012 denying 54 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
May 22, 2012 Filing 59 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 58 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint by Apple Inc.. (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL signed by Judge James Ware granting 56 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 18, 2012 Filing 57 REPLY (re 37 MOTION to Dismiss [REDACTED] ) filed byApple Inc.. (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
May 18, 2012 Filing 56 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
May 18, 2012 Filing 55 RESPONSE (re 54 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 48 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Claims Plaintiffs' L.R. 6-3 Administrative Motion to Enlarge Time for Briefing and Hearing on Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitr ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher S. Yates in Support Thereof)(Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
May 17, 2012 Filing 54 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 48 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Claims Plaintiffs' L.R. 6-3 Administrative Motion to Enlarge Time for Briefing and Hearing on Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration [ECF No. 48] filed by Harry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachele R. Rickert in Support of Plaintiffs' L.R. 6-3 Administrative Motion to Enlarge Time for Briefing and Hearing on Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration [ECF No. 48], # 2 Proposed Order)(Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 16, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 37 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 51 Motion to Shorten Time (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge James Ware granting 43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 16, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 15, 2012 Filing 51 MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing on Apple's Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher S. Yates in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 15, 2012 Filing 50 Proposed Order re 43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 And 79-5(d)] by Apple Inc.. (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME re 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Reply in Support of Motion due by 5/18/2012. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 14, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 Filing 48 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Claims filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Responses due by 5/29/2012. Replies due by 6/5/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 Filing 47 RESPONSE (re 43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 And 79-5(d)] ) filed byApple Inc.. (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 11, 2012 Filing 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time To File Reply in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support)(Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 7, 2012 Filing 45 Declaration of Rachele R. Rickert in Support of 44 Opposition/Response to Motion, Declaration of Rachele R. Rickert In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint [REDACTED] filed byHarry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. (Related document(s) 44 ) (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 Filing 44 RESPONSE (re 43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 And 79-5(d)] ) [REDACTED] filed byHarry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 Filing 43 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 And 79-5(d)] filed by Harry Bass, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell. (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
April 25, 2012 Filing 42 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 41 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eddy Cue In Support)(Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 36 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 16, 2012 Filing 40 Proposed Order re 37 MOTION to Dismiss [REDACTED] by Apple Inc.. (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 16, 2012 Filing 39 Declaration of Shari Ross Lahlou in Support of 37 MOTION to Dismiss [REDACTED] filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 37 ) (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 16, 2012 Filing 38 Declaration of Eddy Cue in Support of 37 MOTION to Dismiss [REDACTED] filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 37 ) (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 16, 2012 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss [REDACTED] filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Responses due by 4/30/2012. Replies due by 5/7/2012. (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 16, 2012 Filing 36 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Chief Judge James Ware granting 32 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Consolidated Complaint and Extending Time to File Opposition Brief (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 27 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 9, 2012 Filing 33 Declaration of Sadik Huseny in Support of 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Consolidated Complaint and Extending Time to File Opposition Brief filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 32 ) (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 9, 2012 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Consolidated Complaint and Extending Time to File Opposition Brief filed by Apple Inc.. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
March 29, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 27 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities., Set Deadlines/Hearings: Responses due by 4/5/2012. Replies due by 4/9/2012. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Motions due by 4/2/2012. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Shorten Time (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 27, 2012 Filing 30 Declaration of Rachele R. Rickert in Support of 29 MOTION to Shorten Time The Pepper Plaintiffs' L.R. 6-3 Motion to Change Time for Briefing and Hearing on Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel [ECF No. 27] filed byHarry Bass, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 27, 2012 Filing 29 MOTION to Shorten Time The Pepper Plaintiffs' L.R. 6-3 Motion to Change Time for Briefing and Hearing on Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel [ECF No. 27] filed by Harry Bass, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 26, 2012 Filing 28 Declaration of Rachele R. Rickert in Support of 27 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byHarry Bass, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits C-F, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) 27 ) (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 26, 2012 Filing 27 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Harry Bass, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Responses due by 4/9/2012. Replies due by 4/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 21, 2012 Filing 26 CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Filed by Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Harry Bass, Stephen H. Schwartz, Eric Terrell, James Blackwell, Crystal Boykin. (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 3/21/2012) Modified on 3/22/2012 (far, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; CONSOLIDATING CASES; DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT, Cases associated., Motions terminated: (14 in 3:11-cv-06714-JW) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/20/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 16, 2012 Filing 24 Declaration of Rachele R. Rickert in Support of 23 Opposition/Response to Motion Declaration of Rachele R. Rickert in Support of Plantiffs' Opposition to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed byHarry Bass, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz. (Related document(s) 23 ) (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 16, 2012 Filing 23 RESPONSE (re 14 MOTION to Dismiss ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed byHarry Bass, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz. (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 15, 2012 Filing 22 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Harry Bass, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz. (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 15, 2012 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harry Bass, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz re 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options, 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options, 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options, 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 15, 2012 Filing 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 15, 2012 Filing 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 15, 2012 Filing 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 15, 2012 Filing 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 7, 2012 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Milton Liskow (Liskow, Michael) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
March 5, 2012 Filing 15 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 14 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 2, 2012 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Responses due by 3/16/2012. Replies due by 3/23/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
March 2, 2012 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
February 29, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2012. Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting case management conference. Signed by Judge James Ware on February 29, 2012. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 10, 2012 Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. James Ware. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RELATING CASE. Case now related to 07-5152 JW. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/9/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)
February 2, 2012 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1 filed by Apple Inc.. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
February 2, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sadik Harry Huseny on behalf of Defendant Apple Inc. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
January 23, 2012 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Pepper, Edward W. Hayter, Harry Bass, Stephen H. Schwartz. Apple Inc. served on 1/12/2012, answer due 2/2/2012. (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Alexander H. Schmidt. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mark C. Rifkin. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 6, 2012 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Alexander H. Schmidt leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611069128.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/6/12 filed by Harry Bass, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 6, 2012 Filing 4 MOTION for Mark C. Rifkin leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611069117.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/6/12 filed by Harry Bass, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2012. Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/29/11. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2011)
December 29, 2011 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Harry Bass, Edward W. Hayter, Robert Pepper, Stephen H. Schwartz re 1 Complaint (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2011)
December 29, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611068684.). Filed byRobert Pepper, Edward W. Hayter, Harry Bass, Stephen H. Schwartz. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2016: # 2 Summons issued Correction of Attachment 1) (kc, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Apple iPhone Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Pepper
Represented By: Francis M. Gregorek
Represented By: Michael Milton Liskow
Represented By: Betsy Carol Manifold
Represented By: Rachele R. Rickert
Represented By: Mark Carl Rifkin
Represented By: Alexander H. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen H. Schwartz
Represented By: Francis M. Gregorek
Represented By: Michael Milton Liskow
Represented By: Betsy Carol Manifold
Represented By: Rachele R. Rickert
Represented By: Mark Carl Rifkin
Represented By: Alexander H. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward W. Hayter
Represented By: Francis M. Gregorek
Represented By: Michael Milton Liskow
Represented By: Betsy Carol Manifold
Represented By: Rachele R. Rickert
Represented By: Mark Carl Rifkin
Represented By: Alexander H. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Bass
Represented By: Francis M. Gregorek
Represented By: Michael Milton Liskow
Represented By: Betsy Carol Manifold
Represented By: Rachele R. Rickert
Represented By: Mark Carl Rifkin
Represented By: Alexander H. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Christopher S. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?