Google Inc. et al v. IPValue Management Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Google, LLC and YouTube, LLC
Defendant: IPValue Management Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011mc80016
Filed: January 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Referring Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re 5 MOTION to Compel filed by YouTube, LLC, Google Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/28/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 8, 2011 Filing 33 OBJECTIONS to re 32 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 30 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 31 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 29 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Google's Response to IPValue's Declarations in Response to Google's Motion to Compel by Google Inc.. (Roberts, Andrea) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 6, 2011 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to Google, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Mitchell Rosenfeld) filed byIPValue Management Inc.. (McMahon, Peter) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
April 6, 2011 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to Google, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Sanjay Prasad) filed byIPValue Management Inc.. (McMahon, Peter) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
April 6, 2011 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to Google, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Produciton of Documents (Steven Shin) filed byIPValue Management Inc.. (McMahon, Peter) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
April 6, 2011 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to Google, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Keith Wilson) filed byIPValue Management Inc.. (McMahon, Peter) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
April 4, 2011 Filing 28 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3-30-11, before Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2011. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
March 30, 2011 Filing 27 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/30/2011 before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman (Date Filed: 3/30/2011) re 5 MOTION to Compel filed by YouTube, LLC, Google Inc., 6 MOTION to Compel filed by YouTube, LLC, Google Inc.. (Court Reporter: Kathy Wyatt) (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/30/2011)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 5 MOTION to Compel, 6 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/24/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 23, 2011 Filing 25 Proposed Order re 6 MOTION to Compel [Proposed] Order Granting In Part and Denying In Part Google, Inc.'s and YouTube, LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by IPValue Management Inc.. (McMahon, Peter) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 22, 2011 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT re 23 Reply to Opposition/Response Certificate of Service by IPValue Management Inc.. (McMahon, Peter) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
March 22, 2011 Filing 23 REPLY (re 5 MOTION to Compel ) Sur-Reply Objection [L.R. 7.3(d)] In Opposition to Google, Inc.'s and You Tube, LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed byIPValue Management Inc.. (McMahon, Peter) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
March 15, 2011 Filing 22 REPLY (re 6 MOTION to Compel ) Google's Reply In Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Third Party IPValue Management Inc. filed byGoogle Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Revised [Proposed] Order)(Roberts, Andrea) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/11/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 11, 2011 Filing 20 STIPULATION to Extension of Time for Google Inc. to File Reply In Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents; and [Proposed] Order by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Roberts, Andrea) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 4, 2011 Filing 19 Statement re 18 Opposition/Response to Motion, Certificate of Service by IPValue Management Inc.. (McMahon, Peter) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 4, 2011 Filing 18 RESPONSE (re 5 MOTION to Compel ) Third Party IPVALUE Management, Inc.'s Opposition to Google, Inc.'s and YouTube, LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed byIPValue Management Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(McMahon, Peter) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/28/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 25, 2011 Filing 16 STIPULATION To Extension of Time for Third Party IPValue Management, Inc to File Opposition to Google, Inc.'s and YouTube, LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Documents; Declaration of Peter C. McMahon; and [Proposed] Order by IPValue Management Inc.. (McMahon, Peter) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SECOND DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/3/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 11 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
February 3, 2011 Filing 13 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 2/3/2011 before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman (Date Filed: 2/3/2011). (Recording #TC 02-11.) (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/3/2011)
February 2, 2011 Filing 12 Memorandum in Opposition Opposition to Google's Motion to Compel filed byIPValue Management Inc.. (Wu, Andrew) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
February 1, 2011 Filing 11 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief in Support of Google Inc. and YouTube Inc.'s Motion to Compel filed by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Eugene Novikov, # 2 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Andrea) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FIRST DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/28/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 8 (UNDER SEAL) Declaration of Eugene Novikov in Support of 5 MOTION to Compel filed byGoogle Inc., YouTube, LLC. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011) Modified on 1/28/2011 (ga, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2011 Filing 7 (UNDER SEAL) Declaration of Eugene Novikov in Support of 5 MOTION to Compel filed byGoogle Inc., YouTube, LLC. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 6 (UNDER SEAL) MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 5 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting re 1 Request filed by YouTube, LLC, Google Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/26/11. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 3 Declaration of Eugene Novikov in Support of 1 Request filed byGoogle Inc., YouTube, LLC. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 2 Declaration of John LaBarre in Support of 1 Request filed byGoogle Inc., YouTube, LLC. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 1 REQUEST To File Documents Under Seal by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 Proposed Order re #5 MOTION to Compel, 6 Under Seal MOTION to Compel by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 Proposed Order re 5 MOTION to Compel, 6 Under Seal MOTION to Compel by Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Google Inc. et al v. IPValue Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google, LLC
Represented By: Andrea Pallios Roberts
Represented By: Charles Kramer Verhoeven
Represented By: David Andrew Perlson
Represented By: Eugene Novikov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YouTube, LLC
Represented By: Andrea Pallios Roberts
Represented By: Charles Kramer Verhoeven
Represented By: David Andrew Perlson
Represented By: Eugene Novikov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPValue Management Inc.
Represented By: Andrew J. Wu
Represented By: Peter Collins McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?