Playvision Labs, Inc. v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: Playvision Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Greg Roberts and Susan Roberts
Case Number: 3:2012cv00171
Filed: January 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING : 41 STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/13/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 23 STIPULATION to Extend the Briefing Schedule and Continue the Hearing on Defendant Greg Roberts' Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/19/2012. Replies due by 7/26/2012. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/27/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 21 STIPULATION to Extend The Briefing Schedule on Defendant Greg Roberts' Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 6/28/2012. Replies due by 7/5/2012. Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/13/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 17 STIPULATION to Stay Action AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/22/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Playvision Labs, Inc. v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Playvision Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Jenna F Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?