Telswitch, Inc. v. Billing Solutions Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Telswitch, Inc.
Defendant: Billing Solutions Incorporated, Sean Dunlea, Tim Portley, Dario J. Saal and Saal Consulting Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00172
Filed: January 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 111 Notice (Other), filed by Billing Solutions Incorporated, Dario J. Saal, Aaron Woolfson, Saal Consulting Inc., Jerry Merkt, Tim Portley, Sean Dunlea, Telswitch, Inc., Merkt-Woolfson, Motions t erminated: 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment / Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Billing Solutions Incorporated, Dario J. Saal, Saal Consulting Inc., Tim Portley, Sean Dunlea.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/25/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER RESETTING FURTHER CMC TO 4/25/13. Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER PERMITTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on February 14, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BY 3/25/13. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/13/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO VACATE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 101 Notice filed by Billing Solutions Incorporated, Dario J. Saal, Aaron Woolfson, Saal Consulting Inc., Jerry Merkt, Tim Portley, Sean Dunlea, Telswitch, Inc., Merkt-Woolfson. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/8/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 54 69 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING MOTION FROM 1/3/13 TO 1/24/13 AT 1:30 P.M. re 64 BSI's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 57) Responses due by 1/2/2013. Replies due by 1/10/2013. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/29/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RESETTING FURTHER CMC FROM 11/9/12 TO 12/14/12 AT 10:30 A.M. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/6/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING FURTHER CMC FROM 11/2/12 TO 11/9/12 re 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER / Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order filed by Billing Solutions Incorporated, Dario J. Saal, Aaron Woolfson, Saal Consulti ng Inc., Jerry Merkt, Tim Portley, Sean Dunlea, Telswitch, Inc., Merkt-Woolfson Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/13/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER RE: 7/13/2012 JOINT LETTER BRIEF (ECF Docket No. 36). Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/6/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR HEARING DATE ON PARTIES' JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER: Discovery Hearing set for 9/6/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/28/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 4/12/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Telswitch, Inc. v. Billing Solutions Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telswitch, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Adam Ridless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billing Solutions Incorporated
Represented By: Eric John Sinrod
Represented By: Suzanne R. Fogarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Dunlea
Represented By: Eric John Sinrod
Represented By: Suzanne R. Fogarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Portley
Represented By: Suzanne R. Fogarty
Represented By: Eric John Sinrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dario J. Saal
Represented By: Suzanne R. Fogarty
Represented By: Eric John Sinrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saal Consulting Inc.
Represented By: Suzanne R. Fogarty
Represented By: Eric John Sinrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?