Valley Forge Insurance Company et al v. Odyssey Thera, Inc.
Plaintiff: Valley Forge Insurance Company and Continental Casualty Company
Defendant: Odyssey Thera, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00227
Filed: January 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING 78 STIPULATION of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/3/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING 76 STIPULATION Extending Scottsdale's time to answer or otherwise appear. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/16/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING 74 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Appear. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 8, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING 69 JOINT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/17/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING 64 STIPULATION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/11/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment;. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/13/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 56 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/13/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 19 Joint MOTION to Continue the Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/4/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/28/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valley Forge Insurance Company et al v. Odyssey Thera, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Forge Insurance Company
Represented By: Marsha L. Morrow
Represented By: Robert Charles Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Robert Charles Christensen
Represented By: Marsha L. Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odyssey Thera, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond Hans Sheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?