F.G. Crosthwaite and Russell E. Burns et al v. Sierra Equipment Rental, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre-Apprenticeship Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Heavy and Highway Committee, Operating Engineers Local Union #3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO and F.G. Crosthwaite and Russell E. Burns |
Defendant: |
Sierra Equipment Rental, Inc. and Mel Weir |
Case Number: |
3:2012cv00327 |
Filed: |
January 20, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Francisco Office |
County: |
Alameda |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan Illston |
Nature of Suit: |
Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 1001 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 22, 2013 |
Filing
42
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/22/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
|
September 12, 2012 |
Filing
20
ORDER :IT IS SO ORDERED.The time limit for service of the Complaint and Summons in this action is hereby extended to OCT. 5 2012; All related deadlines are extended accordingly., 18 MOTION to Continue CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; and RE QUEST TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE filed by Operating Engineers Local Union #3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre-Appren ticeship Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Heavy and Highway Committee, F.G. Crosthwaite and Russell E. Burns, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Fund. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/11/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
|
July 20, 2012 |
Filing
15
ORDER signed on 7/19/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting 14 Motion for Extension until 9/14/12 to serve Complaint (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
|
July 13, 2012 |
Filing
13
ORDER Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/12/12. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/20/12 is continued to 9/21/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions terminated: 12 MOTION to Continue CASE MANAGEMENT CO NFERENCE; DECLARATION OF BLAKE E. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Operating Engineers Local Union #3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Operating Engineers and Parti cipating Employers Pre-Apprenticeship Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Heavy and Highway Committee, F.G. Crosthwaite and Russell E. Burns, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Fund.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
|
April 25, 2012 |
Filing
9
ORDER, Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions terminated: 8 MOTION to Continue CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Operating Engineers Local Union #3 of the In ternational Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre-Apprenticeship Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Heavy and Highway Committee, F.G. Crosthwaite and Russell E. Burns, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Fund.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/25/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
|
February 7, 2012 |
Filing
7
Judge Illston's Standing order (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?