Redick v. Biter
Petitioner: Tyler John Redick
Respondent: Martin Biter
Case Number: 3:2012cv00337
Filed: January 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Presiding Judge: PSLC JNE
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Petition for writ of habeas corpus is DENIED. A certificate of appealability will not issue. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/12/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE TRAVERSE re 31 STIPULATION filed by Tyler John Redick. The Court will grant this final request for continuance, but no more. Traverse due by 6/2/2014. If the traverse is not filed by that date, this matter will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/16/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE TRAVERSE re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Traverse due by 4/18/2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/18/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE TRAVERSE re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Traverse due by 3/19/2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/10/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
November 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE TRAVERSE re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Traverse due by 1/17/2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/11/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2013)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE TRAVERSE re 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Traverse due by 11/18/2013. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/05/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redick v. Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tyler John Redick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Martin Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?