Alimi et al v. Yang
Plaintiff: Saleha Alimi, Zarmina Alimi and United States of America
Defendant: Kailin Yang
Mediator: H. Jay Folberg
Case Number: 3:2012cv00352
Filed: January 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DEADLINE: Re 44 Stipulation filed by Saleha Alimi, Zarmina Alimi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/19/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Referred for the purpose of a Settlement Conference to a randomly-assigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/20/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY to Pro Se, Kailan Yang. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/10/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, Mogeeb Weiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/8/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re 32 Received Order filed by Kailin Yang: Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/19/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Counsel to make the necessary arrangements through CourtCall. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/16/2012. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alimi et al v. Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saleha Alimi
Represented By: Alexander Michael Merchant
Represented By: Joseph Stephen Tobener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zarmina Alimi
Represented By: Alexander Michael Merchant
Represented By: Joseph Stephen Tobener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Douglas K. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kailin Yang
Represented By: Ming Ji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: H. Jay Folberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?