Takeda Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al v. Sandoz, Inc.
Plaintiff: Takeda Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals LLC and Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00446
Filed: January 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING re 98 REDACTED STIPULATION TO AMEND THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER filed by Sandoz, Inc. Motion filing deadline date 2/7/14. Responses due by 2/28/2014. Replies due by 3/14/2014. Motion hearing date to be set at a future case management conference. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/9/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 16, 2013 (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013).
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING re 36 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Sandoz, Inc. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/3/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2012. Case Management Conference re-set for 6/1/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/26/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [Reassigned Case]. Case Management Statement due by 4/27/2012. Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/27/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Takeda Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al v. Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Represented By: Barry Golob
Represented By: Jessica E. La Londe
Represented By: Aaron Scott Lukas
Represented By: Donald R McPhail
Represented By: Kerry B McTigue
Represented By: Richard T. Ruzich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takeda Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Weinberger
Represented By: Heather E. Takahashi
Represented By: Ted G. Dane, Esq.
Represented By: Erin Joan Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Erin Joan Cox
Represented By: Ted G. Dane, Esq.
Represented By: Heather E. Takahashi
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takeda Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Erin Joan Cox
Represented By: Ted G. Dane, Esq.
Represented By: Heather E. Takahashi
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc
Represented By: Erin Joan Cox
Represented By: Ted G. Dane, Esq.
Represented By: Heather E. Takahashi
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?