Robles v. Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC
Plaintiff: Isabel Robles
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv00550
Filed: February 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/12/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Request re: settlement filed by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/1/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/1/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS UPDATE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/27/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re 22 Status Report filed by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/15/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re 17 Status Report filed by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC. Case shall remain stayed. A joint status report shall be filed in 90 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/14/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robles v. Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Robles
Represented By: Nancy Barron
Represented By: Bryan Kemnitzer
Represented By: William Martin Krieg
Represented By: Alexander B. Trueblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC
Represented By: M. Elizabeth Holt
Represented By: Erik Wayne Kemp
Represented By: Donald John Querio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?