Jones v. Marriot Hotel Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Jones
Defendant: Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00587
Filed: February 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED DISMISSAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 78 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION EXTENDING DISCOVERY by Hon. William Alsup granting 76 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING IN PART LEAVE TO AMEND AND RE-FILE COMPLAINT AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion to Amend/Correct]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 62 Letter filed by Christopher Jones]. The Court sets a four-hour meet-and-confer in the Court's jury room starting from 11:00 a.m. and continuing to 3:00 p.m. on Wednesday, Fe bruary 13, 2013, in the Attorneys Lounge on the eighteenth floor of the federal courthouse in San Francisco. Responses due by noon on 2/11/2013. Discovery Hearing set for 2/13/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/7/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup denying 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 49 Motion for Summary Judgment (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [re 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., 43 First MOTION for Summary Judgment re issue of liability filed by Christopher Jones]. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/16/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REQUEST FOR INFORMATION re 38 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., 36 MOTION to Continue Case Mgmt and Trial Dates filed by Christopher Jones (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE by Judge William Alsup [denying 19 Motion to Appear by Telephone]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Marriot Hotel Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Jones
Represented By: Thomas G. Jarrard
Represented By: Matthew Zachary Crotty
Represented By: Stephen Onstot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.
Represented By: Noah A. Levin
Represented By: Michele Ballard Miller
Represented By: Janine Syll Simerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?