Doose v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Plaintiff: Ginn Doose
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00599
Filed: February 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/28/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO RESCHEDULE SETTLEMENT CONFEFERENCE ONLY: filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/28/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/18/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER SETTING CASE SCHEDULE re 61 Proposed Order. Deadline to file Third Amended Complaint: 12/2/2013. Discovery cutoff: 8/20/2014. Dispositive motions to be heard by 8/20/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2014 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 11/3/2014 08:30 AM, both in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/14/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 49 Stipulation to Reschedule Settlement Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/5/2012. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING LITIGANT TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/7/12. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doose v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Represented By: Linda M. Moroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginn Doose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?