Lagarde v. Support.com Inc.

Plaintiff: James Lagarde
Defendant: Support.com Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00609
Filed: February 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/30/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, EXPENSES, AND COLLECTIVE INCENTIVE AWARD. Signed by Magsitrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER RE: MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, EXPENSES, AND COLLECTIVE INCENTIVE AWARD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013) Modified on 3/26/2013 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTATION AND RESCHEDULING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/5/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Parties' Stipulation to Vacate or Continue Case Management Conference filed by James Lagarde, Tim Batchelor. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on October 25, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL COMPLAINT (Dkt. No. 20). Response to amended complaint is due by 5/23/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/9/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012) Modified on 5/9/2012 (ahm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lagarde v. Support.com Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lagarde
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Rafey Sarkis Balabanian
Represented By: Chandler Randolph Givens
Represented By: Sean Patrick Reis
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Support.com Inc.
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?