Ramirez v. Trans Union, LLC
Plaintiff: Sergio L. Ramirez
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv00632
Filed: February 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 322 Motion for Service Award. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 265 Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/25/2017.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/27/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 198 Motion to Decertify Class. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 196 PRETRIAL ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 6/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom D, 15th Floor, San Francis co before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 6/19/2017 to 6/28/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom D, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/15/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 177 Motion to Stay (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2015)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER RE: PROPOSED CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/18/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/12/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/5/2015. Further Case Management Conference reset for 2/12/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/2/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2015)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 111 Motion to Certify Class.(jsclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 134 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(jsclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 119 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 110 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/9/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 87 Motion for Reconsideration (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Consent Order Setting Deadlines by Which Trans Union Must Comply With Court's Order of March 13, 2013 and Extending Class Certification Briefing Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/25/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 84 Stipulated Joint Application to Change Hearing Date on Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of Court's March 15, 2013 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/24/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 79 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion filed by Sergio L. Ramirez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/5/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 51 Motion to Disqualify Counsel ; granting 68 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 52 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY DISPUTE STATEMENT (Dkt. No. 66). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/13/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING TRANSFER by MDL Panel (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULE FOR BRIEFING AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS re 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Sergio L. Ramirez. Reset Deadlines as to 51 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel And For Sanctions, 50 Interim MO TION to Appoint Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)(3), 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 2/6/2013. Replies due by 2/20/2013. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on January 16, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND PHASE I FAST DISCOVERY DEADLINE re 47 Stipulation filed by Sergio L. Ramirez. Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification shall be filed by 7/8/2013. Responses due by 8/12/2013. Replies due by 9/3/2013. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on December 6, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 32 Stipulation Modifying Briefing Schedule. The hearing is reset to October 10, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012) (Entered: 08/02/2012).(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RE: JOINT STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE (Dkt. No. 28). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/25/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE: CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/7/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Stipulation Selecting ADR Process filed by Sergio L. Ramirez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/29/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 9 STIPULATION To Further Extend Time For Defendant TransUnion LLC To Respond To Initial Complaint filed by Trans Union, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/30/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio L. Ramirez
Represented By: Carol McLean Brewer
Represented By: James A. Francis
Represented By: Andrew J. Ogilvie
Represented By: John Soumilas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Babcox Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?