Lounibos v. Keypoint Government Solutions Inc
Plaintiff: Donald Lounibos
Defendant: Keypoint Government Solutions Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv00636
Filed: February 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT; APPROVING NOTICE TO THE CLASS; SETTING DATES AND PROCEDURES FOR FINAL FAIRNESS HEARING by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 56 Motion for Settlement. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER VACATING HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 56 MOTION for Settlement (Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class-Action Settlement, Conditional Certification of Settlement Class and Approval of Notice Program) filed by Donald Lounibos. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 17, 2014. CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 64 . (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING JANUARY 22, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Keypoint Government Solutions Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 10, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING PLAINTIFFS DEADLINE TO FILE NEW MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed by Donald Lounibos. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 2, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Plaintiff's Deadline to File New Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Donald Lounibos. Motion due by 11/14/2013. Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 29, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Plaintiff's Deadline to File New Motion For Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Donald Lounibos. Motion due by 10/30/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 8, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Plaintiff's Deadline to File New Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Donald Lounibos. Motion due by 10/9/2013. Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 6, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 38 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS-ACTION SETTLEMENT, CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS AND APPROVAL OF NOTICE PROGRAM. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR FILING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed by Donald Lounibos Case Management Statement due by 3/21/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/24/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR FILING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION filed by Donald Lounibos, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR FILING MOTION F OR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION. Case Management Statement due by 2/21/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/9/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC to 2/14/13 at 1:30 p.m. AND SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF ASETTLEMENT re 26 Notice (Other), filed by Donald Lounibos Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2013. Further Case Manageme nt Conference set for 2/14/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Motion due by 1/10/2013.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/20/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 24 CONTINUING ADR DEADLINE AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/15/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 MOTION to Continue ADR deadline to 10/15/12 [STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING ADR DEADLINE] filed by Keypoint Government Solutions Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/16/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: DISCOVERY AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS] filed by Keypoint Government Solutions Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/25/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE TO 9/15/12 AND RESETTING FURTHER CMC TO 10/26/12 at 10:30 a.m. re 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING ADR DEADLINE AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Keypoint Government Solutions Inc Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lounibos v. Keypoint Government Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Lounibos
Represented By: David S. Harris
Represented By: Steven Lee Hammond
Represented By: Francis Shehadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keypoint Government Solutions Inc
Represented By: Michelle B. Heverly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?