Flores et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Julio Flores, Adriana Flores, Daniela Flores and Liana Flores
Defendant: State of California, Union Pacific Railroad Company, County Of Monterey and National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv00686
Filed: February 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DISMISSING CASE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/16/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re 76 Notice (Other) filed by Liana Flores, Daniela Flores, Adriana Flores, Julio Flores. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/9/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO DISMISS DEFENDANT COUNTY OF MONTEREY re 74 Stipulation filed by Liana Flores, Daniela Flores, Adriana Flores, Julio Flores. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/10/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James denying 72 Stipulation (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 53 Stipulation to Modify Dispositive Motion Schedule. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 51 Letter filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company, National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/9/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Maria-Elena James granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING 36 Stipulation selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 6, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 34 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/23/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores et al v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Of Monterey
Represented By: William Merrill Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Flores
Represented By: Joel Robert Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Flores
Represented By: Joel Robert Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniela Flores
Represented By: Joel Robert Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liana Flores
Represented By: Joel Robert Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?