Mycone Dental Supply Co., Inc. v. Creative Nail Design, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mycone Dental Supply Co., Inc.
Defendant: Creative Nail Design, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00747
Filed: February 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Mycone Dental Supply Co., Inc., Mycone Dental Supply Co., Inc., Creative Nail Design, Inc. and Creative Nail Design, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/31/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND NEAR-TERM DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/25/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND NEAR-TERM DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/10/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 194 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND NEAR-TERM DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/26/14. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND NEAR-TERM DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/11/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND NEAR-TERM DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/31/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 179 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 174 Discovery Letter Brief. The letter is denied without prejudice and the parties are ordered to continue to meet and confer regarding the discovery dispute. If the parties are unable to resolve the dispute without court intervention, the parties must follow the court's standing order on discovery, see Docket No. 91 , and file a joint discovery letter by December 9, 2013. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING FACT DISCOVERY WITH RESPECT TO TWO THIRD PARTY DEPOSITIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/27/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO EXCHANGE EXPERT REPORTS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/12/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/23/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR THE PARTIES TO EXCHANGE EXPERT REPORTS AND MODIFYING THE SCHEDULING ORDER WITH RESPECT TO DEPOSITION DAYS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/25/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 139 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS TO JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/30/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINES TO EXCHANGE EXPERT REPORTS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/26/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING HEARING re 139 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Young Nails, Inc., Mycone Dental Supply Co., Inc., Amco, Cacee, Inc., Nail Systems International, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 139 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/31/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 07/12/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 133 Motion to Amend/Correct.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER. Plaintiff and Third-Party Defendants have represented in the motion to amend invalidity contentions 133 but not its accompanying declaration that the motion is unopposed by Defendant. If Defendant does not oppose the Motion, Defendant shall file a notice of non-opposition by July 5, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/28/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 130 Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Deadlines and the Deadlines to Exchange Expert Reports. Discovery of expert witnesses to be completed by 1/10/2014.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 06/10/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINES AND THE DEADLINES TO EXCHANGE EXPERT REPORTS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/29/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION AND ORDER GOVERNING E-DISCOVER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/18/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 111 TO RESCHEDULE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. Claim Construction Hearing set for 4/10/2013 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/14/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 109 EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT CREATIVE NAIL DESIGN, INC. TO FILE ITS REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF PURSUANT TO PATENT LOCAL RULE 4-5. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/11/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 103 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR THE PARTIES TO EXCHANGE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/7/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/3/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 89 Motion to Compel and establishing discovery procedures.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012) Modified on 11/21/2012 (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 86 EXTENDING TIME FOR THE PARTIES TO EXCHANGE PRELIMINARY CLAIM CONSTRUCTIONS AND EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO PATENT LOCAL RULE 4-2. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/5/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Claims Construction Hearing set for 2/27/2013 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/22/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 48 TO EXTEND TIME RE: ADR DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/25/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/15/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mycone Dental Supply Co., Inc. v. Creative Nail Design, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mycone Dental Supply Co., Inc.
Represented By: John Michael Farrell
Represented By: Charles W. Duncan, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Lane
Represented By: Jonathan Elliot Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Nail Design, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Fuhrer
Represented By: Adam R. Hess
Represented By: Duane H. Mathiowetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?