What 4 LLC et al v. Roman & Williams, Inc et al
Plaintiff: What 4 LLC and 1095 Market Street Holding LLC
Defendant: Roman & Williams, Inc, Robin Standefer and Stephen Alesch
Case Number: 3:2012cv00784
Filed: February 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 46 Stipulation filed by Stephen Alesch, Robin Standefer, Roman & Williams, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/27/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RESETTING FURTHER CMC from 12/11/12 to 2/21/13 at 10:30 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 2/14/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/4/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re 40 Substitution of Counsel filed by What 4 LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/19/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 16 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Leave to File Surreply and Response to Surreply. On or before 3/30/2012, Plaintiffs may file a Surreply. On or before 4/6/2012, Defendants may file a Response to Plaintiffs' Surreply. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/29/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/1/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: What 4 LLC et al v. Roman & Williams, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: What 4 LLC
Represented By: Kassra Powell Nassiri
Represented By: Michael Patrick Dillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1095 Market Street Holding LLC
Represented By: Kassra Powell Nassiri
Represented By: Michael Patrick Dillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman & Williams, Inc
Represented By: Jerrold Evan Abeles
Represented By: Joseph Louis Cavinato, III
Represented By: Philip A. Leider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Standefer
Represented By: Jerrold Evan Abeles
Represented By: Joseph Louis Cavinato, III
Represented By: Philip A. Leider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Alesch
Represented By: Jerrold Evan Abeles
Represented By: Joseph Louis Cavinato, III
Represented By: Philip A. Leider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?