Ahmmed v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Mohsin Ahmmed
Defendant: Bank of America N.A. and Quality Loan Service Corp.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00789
Filed: February 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS AS TO FEDERAL CLAIMS AND REMANDING MATTER. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/4/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO REMAND AND MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/25/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING 39 Request to Re-Schedule Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/22/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 32 Quality's Declaration of Nonmonetary Status. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. Whtie on 5/11/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2012: # 1 Certificate of Service) (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 4/6/2012. Replies due by 4/20/2012. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/13/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmmed v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Victoria Elena Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp.
Represented By: Julie Oliva Molteni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohsin Ahmmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?