Schmidt et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: John Schmidt and Provider Compliance Solutions
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv00875
Filed: February 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 1/2/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re #41 Notice (Other) filed by John Schmidt, Provider Compliance Solutions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/20/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 20, 2012 Filing 41 NOTICE by Provider Compliance Solutions, John Schmidt Of Settlement (Chae, Larry) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/17/12. *Amended to correct typographical error from Jan., 28, 2013 to Jan. 18, 2013. All other dates remain unchanged.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 1/7/2013 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/14/12. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER: Updated Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2013 AT 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Motion filing deadline by 4/15/2013. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/2/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
November 1, 2012 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
October 31, 2012 Filing 37 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/30/2012 before Joseph C. Spero. Case referred to a magistrate judge for a settlement conference. Updated joint cmc statement due 1/11/13. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Recording #Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/31/2012)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order, signed as modifed on 10/23/12, by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #32 Motion to Appear by Telephone for Kevin J. Tully at the case management conference on 10/30/12 at 1:30 PM.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order, signed as modified on 10/23/12, by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #34 Stipulation to Appear by Phone at the Case Management Conference set for 10/30/12 at 1:30 PM.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Request to Appear Telephonically at Initial Case Management Conference Scheduled for October 26, 2012 filed by Provider Compliance Solutions, John Schmidt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chae, Larry) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 33 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Updated filed by Provider Compliance Solutions, John Schmidt. (Chae, Larry) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 32 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Defendant Ford Motor Company's Request to Appear Telephonically at Further Case Management Conference Scheduled for October 30, 2012 filed by Ford Motor Company. (Tully, Kevin) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
September 26, 2012 Filing 31 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session 9/17/2012 case not settled mediation complete. Signed by Mediator, Thomas HR Denver, dated 9/17/2012. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 30 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2012. Further Case Management Conference specially re-set for 10/30/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this Notice . (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order, signed 8/30/12, by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #28 Stipulation Seeking Relief from the Court's Case Management Order. Mediation extended to 10/5/12. Case Management Conference continued to 10/26/12 at 1:30 PM(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 30, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 28, 2012 Filing 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Request for Relief from the Court's Case Management Order filed by Provider Compliance Solutions, John Schmidt. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), #2 Proposed Order)(Chae, Larry) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER: An updated joint case management conference statement shall be due by September 7, 2012. further case management conference is set for September 14, 2012, at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/18/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 18, 2012 Filing 26 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Thomas H.R. Denver as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
June 18, 2012 Filing 25 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/15/2012 before Joseph C. Spero. Case referred to Court's ADR for mediation. Case Management Statement due by 9/7/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Recording #Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/18/2012)
June 14, 2012 Filing 24 ADR Clerks Notice Vacating Appointment of Mediator, John Koeppel #23 . The ADR Program will appoint another mediator as soon as possible. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 14, 2012 OBJECTIONS received to #23 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Mediator, John Koeppel. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 23 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing John Koeppel as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER, signed on 6/5/12, by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #21 Motion to Appear by Telephone for Larry Chae on 6/15/12 at 1:30 PM for the case management conference. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
June 4, 2012 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear by Telephone Request to Appear Telephonically at Initial Case Management Conference Scheduled for June 15, 2012 filed by Provider Compliance Solutions, John Schmidt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Chae, Larry) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, signed as modified on 6/4/12, by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #16 Motion to Appear by Telephone for Kevin Tully on 6/15/12 at 1:30 PM (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/4/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
June 1, 2012 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Provider Compliance Solutions, John Schmidt. (Chae, Larry) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
June 1, 2012 Filing 17 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Provider Compliance Solutions, John Schmidt filed by Provider Compliance Solutions, John Schmidt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chae, Larry) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
June 1, 2012 Filing 16 First MOTION to Appear by Telephone Defendant Ford Motor Company's Request to Appear Telephonically at Initial Case Management Conference filed by Ford Motor Company. (Tully, Kevin) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
June 1, 2012 Filing 15 Statement of Defendant Ford Motor Company Company's FRCP Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (Tully, Kevin) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
May 30, 2012 Filing 14 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Chae, Larry) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 22, 2012 Filing 13 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Provider Compliance Solutions, John Schmidt filed by Provider Compliance Solutions, John Schmidt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chae, Larry) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 18, 2012 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Provider Compliance Solutions, John Schmidt.. (Chae, Larry) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
April 18, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Larry Chae (Chae, Larry) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
March 27, 2012 Filing 10 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company .. (Tully, Kevin) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 26, 2012 Filing 9 CLERKS NOTICE To All Counsel re: Consent or Declination. Form due by 4/9/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 26, 2012 Filing 8 Defendant Ford Motor Company's ANSWER to Complaint for Damages byFord Motor Company. (Tully, Kevin) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 12, 2012 Filing 7 CLERKS NOTICE To Plaintiffs re: Consent or Declination. Form due by 3/26/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
March 12, 2012 Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2012. Case Management Conference re-set for 6/15/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
March 8, 2012 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Schmidt, Provider Compliance Solutions. Ford Motor Company served on 3/6/2012, answer due 3/27/2012. (Chae, Larry) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
February 23, 2012 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Provider Compliance Solutions, John Schmidt (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012) (far, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2012 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012) (far, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2012 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
February 23, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of The Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act against Ford Motor Company ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 44611088427). DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Filed byJohn Schmidt, Provider Compliance Solutions. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2012: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (far, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmidt et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Schmidt
Represented By: Brian Joseph Bickel,
Represented By: Brian Kelly Cline
Represented By: Larry Chae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Provider Compliance Solutions
Represented By: Brian Kelly Cline
Represented By: Brian Joseph Bickel,
Represented By: Larry Chae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Kevin J. Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?