Oliver v. Microsoft Corporation
Plaintiff: K. Oliver
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv00943
Filed: February 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SATISFACTION OF AWARD OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/19/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/5/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER re 84 85 86 87 discovery disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/24/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXPERT DISCLOSURES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/17/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting 65 Discovery Letter Brief; Granting 66 Discovery Letter Brief. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER regarding 60 the parties' joint discovery dispute letter dated December 19, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/4/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 51 FILING OF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/15/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2013 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2013 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 9/23/2013 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 9/23/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/28/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/24/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CMC TO 9/27/12 AT 1:30 P.M. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/30/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 36 TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/3/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Seeborg denying without prejudice 19 Motion to Relate Case (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Hon. Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/2/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. Oliver
Represented By: Kathleen M. Lucas
Represented By: Shawna Bree Casebier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Lynne C. Hermle
Represented By: Jessica Perry
Represented By: Jessica R. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?