October 25, 2016 |
Filing
223
ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 214 Motion for Settlement. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
|
August 8, 2016 |
Filing
207
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 206 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Opt-Out Process filed by Alice Grothmann, Alyn Goldsmith, Deborah Elite, Susanne Beadle, Retiree Support Group of Contra Costa County, Billie Joe Wilson Elkin, Michael Sloan. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 8, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
|
August 3, 2016 |
Filing
204
PROTECTIVE ORDER re 203 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Protective filed by Alice Grothmann, Alyn Goldsmith, Susanne Beadle, Retiree Support Group of Contra Costa County, Billie Joe Wilson Elkin, Michael Sloan. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
|
July 29, 2016 |
Filing
199
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 183 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re: Improper Class Communications. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
|
July 11, 2016 |
Filing
182
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 181 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation That No Response To Third Amended Complaint For Settlement Purposes Is Necessary And Alternatively And Additionally An Extension Of Time To Respond To Third Amended Complaint filed by Contra Costa County. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
|
June 17, 2016 |
Filing
174
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO INTERVENE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying 150 Motion to Intervene. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
|
June 14, 2016 |
Filing
169
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, CONDITIONALLY CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 137 Motion for Settlement. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
|
April 4, 2016 |
Filing
142
ORDER VACATING HEARING re 137 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 4, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016).
|
February 3, 2016 |
Filing
135
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 134 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 133 Stipulation and Order, STIPULATION CHANGING HEARING DATE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Contra Costa County. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
|
January 29, 2016 |
Filing
133
ORDER GRANTING IN PART STIPULATION TO EXTEND CASE DEADLINES re 132 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING CASE DEADLINES filed by Contra Costa County. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 29, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
|
August 31, 2015 |
Filing
119
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CONTINUING CASE DEADLINES. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Bench Trial set for 8/15/2016 - 8/18/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 31, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
|
March 12, 2015 |
Filing
115
MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE TO PRIVATE ADR. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 12, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
|
March 5, 2015 |
Filing
114
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 113 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Extending Case Deadlines and [Proposed] Order filed by Contra Costa County. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 5, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2015)
|
February 20, 2015 |
Filing
112
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 111 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Extending Case Deadlines And [Proposed] Order filed by Contra Costa County. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 20, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2015)
|
December 18, 2014 |
Filing
109
Discovery Order re: 108 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Re Plaintiff's Deposition Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6) filed by Contra Costa County. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/18/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
|
September 30, 2014 |
Filing
106
Discovery Order re: 101 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Retiree Support Group of Contra Costa County. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/30/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
|
September 23, 2014 |
Filing
102
Discovery Order re: Dkt. No. 101 . Parties must confirm whether they complied with the in-person meet and confer requirement. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/23/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
|
July 16, 2014 |
Filing
96
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 95 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE PRODUCTION OF CLOSED SESSION RECORDS WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO CLAIMS OF PRIVILEGE filed by Contra Costa County. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 16, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
|
June 4, 2014 |
Filing
94
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 93 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Discovery Limits and Case Deadlines filed by Retiree Support Group of Contra Costa County. Fact Discovery due by 1/20/2015. Expert Disclosures due by 2/23/2015. Expert Rebuttal due by 3/12/2015. Expert Discovery due by 4/9/2015. Dispositve Motions due by 5/7/2015. Pretrial Conference Statement due by 6/22/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Bench Trial set for 7/20/2015 - 7/24/2015 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 4, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
|
January 16, 2014 |
Filing
89
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 88 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Case Deadlines filed by Retiree Support Group of Contra Costa County. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 16, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
|
November 21, 2013 |
Filing
87
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO AMEND PLEADINGS filed by Retiree Support Group of Contra Costa County. Amended Pleadings due by 1/21/2014. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 21, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
|
September 27, 2013 |
Filing
83
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR EACH SIDE TO PROPOUND 35 INTERROGATORIES WITHOUT LEAVE OF THE COURT filed by Contra Costa County. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 27, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
|
August 22, 2013 |
Filing
80
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Contra Costa County. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 22, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
|
May 8, 2013 |
Filing
70
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 44 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
|
January 22, 2013 |
Filing
55
ORDER GRANTING 54 STIPULATION CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/22/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
|
October 2, 2012 |
Filing
42
DISCOVERY ORDER re 41 Letter Brief filed by Retiree Support Group of Contra Costa County. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/2/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
|
August 24, 2012 |
Filing
40
ORDER RE NOTICE OF DISCOVERY REFERRAL re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/24/2012. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
|
August 23, 2012 |
Filing
39
ORDER OF REFERRAL re 38 Letter Brief filed by Retiree Support Group of Contra Costa County. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 23, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
|
August 6, 2012 |
Filing
37
ORDER GRANTING 35 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, VOLUNTARY PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND RESETTING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/6/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
|
May 21, 2012 |
Filing
27
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 24 TO EXTEND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/21/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
|
March 9, 2012 |
Filing
10
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Time For Filing First Responsive Pleading filed by Contra Costa County. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/9/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
|