Fotinos v. Fotinos et al
Plaintiff: Michele Fotinos
Defendant: Robyn Pitts, Mark Reed, Patrick Carey, Shannon Morgan, City of Belmont, Kamala Harris, Jayne Kim, County of San Mateo, Bonnie Miller, John Fotinos, Dawn Grover and Renee La Farge
Case Number: 3:2012cv00953
Filed: February 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANTS ( 99 , 100 , 101 , 111 , 116 ) MOTIONS TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Denying PLAINTIFFS 122 APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenGRANTING PLAINTIFFS ( 87 , 88 ) EX PARTE APPLICATIONS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND STRIKING IMPROPERLY FILED DOCUMENTS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenGRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 85 EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: DOCUMENTS CONTAINING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANTS ( 18 , 22 , 26 , 33 , 34 , 58 , 61 , 62 ) MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS 46 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 48 MOTION TO SEAL, STRIKING IMPROPERLY FILED 47 DOCUMENT AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO REVIEW ALL DOCUMENTS ON THE DOCKET. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 65 Ex Parte Application for relief from default in filing opposition to Defendant Miller's Motion to Dismiss and for Leave to File Oversized Memorandum. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER STRIKING IMPROPERLY FILED 43 , 44 DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/25/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fotinos v. Fotinos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Belmont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayne Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Mateo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Fotinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Grover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee La Farge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Fotinos
Represented By: Patricia Joan Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?