Wright et al v. Adventures Rolling Cross Country, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Trame and Peter Wright
Defendant: Adventures Rolling Cross Country, Inc. and Scott Von Eschen
Case Number: 3:2012cv00982
Filed: February 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 169 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE TO FILE FINAL APPROVAL MOTION filed by Michelle Trame, Peter Wright. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/22/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING BY 9/11/13 re 154 Statement filed by Michelle Trame, Peter Wright. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/4/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Re Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/29/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 143 GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Michelle Trame, Peter Wright. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/20/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 139 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Deadline for Submission of Joint Supplemental Brief filed by Adventures Rolling Cross Country, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/29/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 135 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 134 Order on Motion to Certify Class,, filed by Adventures Rolling Cross Country, Inc. Joint Supplmental Brief due 7/19/13 by 4:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 127 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 and for Conditional Certification under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b). The parties are ordered to meet and confer re garding the proposed class notice and consent form. By July 15, 2013, the parties shall file a joint supplemental brief regarding the notice and form. At this juncture, the Court shall maintain the hearing date of July 25, 2013. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 131 to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Joint) filed by Adventures Rolling Cross Country, Inc., Scott Von Eschen. Responses due by 7/3/2013. Replies due by 7/10/2013. Motion Hearing reset for 7/25/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/31/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 97 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and Denying 101 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER re briefing on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/5/2013. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 90 for Dismissal of Counterclaims filed by Adventures Rolling Cross Country, Inc., Scott Von Eschen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/26/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC FOR 11/15/12 re 88 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Adventures Rolling Cross Country, Inc., Scott Von Eschen Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/22/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 81 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Adventures Rolling Cross Country, Inc., Scott Von Eschen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/29/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC TO 11/9/12 re 83 Stipulation filed by Adventures Rolling Cross Country, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/28/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Re Corrective Notice. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/5/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER i>REGARDING CONTINUING DEADLINES AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE UNTIL AFTER THE COMPLETION OF PRIVATE MEDIATION filed by Michelle Trame, Peter Wright, Motions terminated: 52 MOTION to Strike and 53 Admin istrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS filed by Michelle Trame. Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/28/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Prohibiting Defendants from Directly Contacting Plaintiffs and Potential Class Members; and Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for a Corrective Notice 18 23 . (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/14/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright et al v. Adventures Rolling Cross Country, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Trame
Represented By: Hillary Jo Benham-Baker
Represented By: David Adam Lowe
Represented By: John T. Mullan
Represented By: Bryan Jeffrey Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Wright
Represented By: Bryan Jeffrey Schwartz
Represented By: John T. Mullan
Represented By: David Adam Lowe
Represented By: Hillary Jo Benham-Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adventures Rolling Cross Country, Inc.
Represented By: Thad Alan Davis
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Von Eschen
Represented By: Thad Alan Davis
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?