Network Protection Sciences, LLC v. Juniper Networks, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Network Protection Sciences, LLC
Defendant: Juniper Networks, Inc., Fortinet, Inc., Watchguard Technologies, Inc., Sonicwall, Inc. and Deep Nines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01106
Filed: March 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 311) by Hon. William Alsup granting 311 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 316) re 316 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 40 to Declaration of Jill F Kopeikin in Support of Network Protection Sciences' Oppositions to Fortinet's Motions in Limine Nos 1-5 filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 30, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED DISMISSAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 343 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTIONS TO SEAL (DKT. NOS. 260, 291) re 260 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC, 326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 332 Exhibits filed by Fortinet, Inc., 327 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 333 Exhibits, filed by Fortinet, Inc., 291 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 26, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. NO. 272) by Hon. William Alsup denying 272 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER RE SEALING MOTION (DKT. NO. 243) re 243 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Designated by Fortinet filed by Network Protection Sciences, LLC. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 12, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER GRANTING IN PART REQUEST TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 263 Ex Parte Application.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER GRANTING CENTANNI PHV by Hon. William Alsup granting 256 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup granting 247 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [denying 207 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 231 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY JILLIAN CENTANNI by Hon. William Alsup denying 217 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL MATERIAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 221 Motion leave to file.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY CHAN re 216 Notice (Other) filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 1, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW MACARTHUR by Judge Alsup denying 208 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; denying 210 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINES by Hon. William Alsup granting 205 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 191 Motion to Amend/Correct ;.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 185 TENTATIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER, REQUEST FOR CRITIQUE AND ORDER STRIKING REPLY MATERIALS IN PART (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 165 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 17, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 9, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER DISMISSING ALL DEFENDANTS EXCEPT FORTINET, INC. FOR MISJOINDER UNDER FRCP 21 re 145 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 13, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING MISJOINDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 6, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 135 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Network Protection Sciences, LLC v. Juniper Networks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Network Protection Sciences, LLC
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Michael Cukor
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juniper Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Eric B Hanson
Represented By: Douglas James Dixon
Represented By: David Craig McPhie
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortinet, Inc.
Represented By: Robin Lynn Brewer
Represented By: Michele Kim Connors
Represented By: Stefani E Shanberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watchguard Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Binney
Represented By: David T McDonald
Represented By: James George Warriner
Represented By: Roderick Bland Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonicwall, Inc.
Represented By: Adam G Price
Represented By: W Brent Rasmussen
Represented By: Colby Brian Springer
Represented By: Kenneth Brian Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deep Nines, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Goldfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?