Steinfeld v. Discover Financial Services et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Steinfeld
Defendant: Discover Financial Services, DFS Services, LLC and Discover Bank
Case Number: 3:2012cv01118
Filed: March 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 64 Motion for Attorney Fees. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING 75 Notice of Withdrawal of Objection. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/3/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REVISED ORDER GRANTING 58 (1) CONDITIONALLY CERTIFYING A SETTLEMENT CLASS, (2) PRELIMINARILY APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, (3) APPROVING NOTICE PLAN, AND (4) SETTING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING. Signed by Judge Susan Illston for Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/10/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013) Modified on 9/10/2013 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING 48 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT REVISED PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/29/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/23/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/27/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING 50 STIPULATION re 47 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/28/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING 45 STIPULATION To Continue Deadline For Plaintiff To File Unopposed Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Settlement From May 3, 2013 To May 17, 2013. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/2/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 43 STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUE HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/17/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING 40 STIPULATION TO SET A BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR PRELIMINARY SETTLEMENT APPROVAL. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/12/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING 38 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FROM MARCH 25, 2013 TO APRIL 8, 2013. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/26/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING 36 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/12/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 34 Stipulation To Continue Deadline For Defendants To Respond To Complaint To March 11, 2013 And Initial Case Management Conference To April 19, 2013. Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/11/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 32 STIPULATION To Continue Deadline For Defendants To Respond To Complaint From December 11, 2012 To February 11, 2013 And Initial Case Management Conference From January 18, 2013.Case Management Statement due by 3/15/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/13/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING 28 STIPULATION To Continue Deadline For Defendants To Respond To Complaint from October 11, 2012 To December 11, 2012 And Initial Case Management Conference From November 16, 2012 To January 18, 2013. Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/15/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 20 Stipulation Regarding Case Schedule. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2012 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 20, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 18 STIPULATION Regarding Case Schedule. Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/16/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 16 STIPULATION Regarding Case Scheduling. Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/4/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING 10 STIPULATION Regarding Case Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/8/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steinfeld v. Discover Financial Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Steinfeld
Represented By: Kristen Law Sagafi
Represented By: David P. Meyer
Represented By: Daniel M. Hutchinson
Represented By: Mark Daniel Ankcorn
Represented By: Jonathan David Selbin
Represented By: Beth E. Terrell
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Financial Services
Represented By: Lisa Marie Simonetti
Represented By: Jason S Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFS Services, LLC
Represented By: Lisa Marie Simonetti
Represented By: Jason S Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Represented By: Lisa Marie Simonetti
Represented By: Jason S Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?