Yahoo! Inc. v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Yahoo! Inc.
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01212
Filed: March 12, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2012 40 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 39 STIPULATION DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/10/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 9, 2012 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING CASE filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Smith, Kevin) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
June 20, 2012 38 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 37 STIPULATION re 16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, 29 MOTION to Strike and/or Dismiss Yahoo Inc.'s Claims and Defenses of Inequitable Conduct filed by Yahoo! Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, 29 MOTION to Strike and/or Dismiss Yahoo Inc.'s Claims and Defenses of Inequitable Conduct , 29 MOTION to Strike and/or Dismiss Yahoo Inc.'s Claims and Defenses of Inequitable Conduct. Responses due by 7/19/2012. Replies due by 7/26/2012. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/20/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 19, 2012 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, 29 MOTION to Strike and/or Dismiss Yahoo Inc.'s Claims and Defenses of Inequitable Conduct filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Smith, Kevin) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 13, 2012 36 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 7, 2012 35 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 34 STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME RE ANSWER AND CONTINUING BRIEFING AND HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE. Responses due by 7/5/2012. Replies due by 7/12/2012. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/7/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 6, 2012 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 28 Answer to to CounterClaim, Counterclaim, 29 MOTION to Strike and/or Dismiss Yahoo Inc.'s Claims and Defenses of Inequitable Conduct filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Smith, Kevin) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
May 31, 2012 33 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 29 MOTION to Strike and/or Dismiss Yahoo Inc.'s Claims and Defenses of Inequitable Conduct. Opposition due by 6/20/2012. Replies due by 6/27/2012. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/31/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 30, 2012 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 29 MOTION to Strike and/or Dismiss Yahoo Inc.'s Claims and Defenses of Inequitable Conduct filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Smith, Kevin) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 16, 2012 31 Proposed Order re 29 MOTION to Strike and/or Dismiss Yahoo Inc.'s Claims and Defenses of Inequitable Conduct by Facebook, Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 16, 2012 30 Declaration of Heidi L. Keefe in Support of 29 MOTION to Strike and/or Dismiss Yahoo Inc.'s Claims and Defenses of Inequitable Conduct filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 16, 2012 29 MOTION to Strike and/or Dismiss Yahoo Inc.'s Claims and Defenses of Inequitable Conduct filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 5/30/2012. Replies due by 6/6/2012. (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
April 27, 2012 28 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Facebook, Inc. byYahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Smith, Kevin) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 11, 2012 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Francis Haag (Haag, Joseph) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
April 11, 2012 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Daniel Selwyn (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
April 6, 2012 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian James Dunne on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Dunne, Brian) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
April 5, 2012 24 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for William F. Lee (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 5, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Cynthia D. Vreeland (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 3, 2012 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by William F. Lee ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611072489.) filed by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
April 3, 2012 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Cynthia D. Vreeland ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611072488.) filed by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
April 3, 2012 16 Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Yahoo! Inc. byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Neal, Stephen) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
March 21, 2012 14 Featured Case INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2012.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/21/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 21, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Hon. William Alsup no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/21/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 21, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judges William Alsup and Jeffrey S. White on 3/20/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 19, 2012 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yahoo! Inc. Facebook, Inc. served on 3/13/2012, answer due 4/3/2012. (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 19, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/19/12. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 15, 2012 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 8 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge ----Proof of Service (Smith, Kevin) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 14, 2012 8 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Yahoo! Inc. . (Smith, Kevin) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
March 12, 2012 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding: PATENT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
March 12, 2012 5 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
March 12, 2012 3 Certificate of Interested Entities or Parties; by Yahoo! Inc. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
March 12, 2012 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT: JURY TRIAL DEMANDED; against Facebook, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 54611011490.). Filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 01, # 2 Exhibit 02, # 3 Exhibit 03, # 4 Exhibit 04, # 5 Exhibit 05, # 6 Exhibit 06, # 7 Exhibit 07, # 8 Exhibit 08, # 9 Exhibit 09, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yahoo! Inc. v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yahoo! Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer A. Kash
Represented By: Brian James Dunne
Represented By: Kevin Alexander Smith
Represented By: Charles Kramer Verhoeven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Francis Haag
Represented By: Heidi Lyn Keefe
Represented By: Stephen Cassidy Neal
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Mark Daniel Selwyn
Represented By: Cynthia D. Vreeland
Represented By: Mark R. Weinstein
Represented By: Lee F. William
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?