Levy v. Comerica Bank
Plaintiff: Marc Olin Levy
Defendant: Comerica Bank
Case Number: 3:2012cv01296
Filed: March 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/3/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER VACATING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/26/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/12/2012 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 6/28/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/7/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levy v. Comerica Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Olin Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comerica Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?