Brod v. Sioux Honey Association,Cooperative
Plaintiff: Gregory Brod
Defendant: Sioux Honey Association,Cooperative
Case Number: 3:2012cv01322
Filed: March 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 56 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 58 Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply re Motion to Dismiss filed by Gregory Brod, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 58 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 56 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Secon d Amended Complaint [FRCP Rules 12(b)(1)(6)] re Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply re Motion to Dismiss, 56 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [FRCP Rules 12(b)(1)(6)]. Responses due by 11/15/2012. Replies due by 11/27/2012.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/6/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING WITHDRAWAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE AND APPOINT INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL re (42 in 3:12-cv-01322-EMC,) MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel, (37 in 3:12-cv-01645-EMC) Cross MOTION to Appoint Interim Lead Class Counsel filed by Soraya Ross, (53 in 3:12-cv-01322-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER, (47 in 3:12-cv-01645-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on October 1, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 25 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING TRANSFER by MDL Panel. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING MOTION AND CMC TO 8/10/12 AT 1:30 P.M., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 25 MOTION to Dismiss . Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/18/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 Extending Time for Sioux Honey Association Cooperative to file a Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Sioux Honey Association,Cooperative. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/28/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 25 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 6/20/2012. Replies due by 6/27/2012. Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/6/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 4/12/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brod v. Sioux Honey Association,Cooperative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Brod
Represented By: Jon Michael Herskowitz
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Represented By: Robert Ian Lax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sioux Honey Association,Cooperative
Represented By: David Ian Dalby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?