Palmer et al v. Countrywide et al
Plaintiff: Randy Palmer and Yolanda Palmer
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A. and Countrywide
Case Number: 3:2012cv01332
Filed: March 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; VACATING NOVEMBER 30, 2012 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 20, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: Plaintiffs having failed to state a claim, the above-titled action is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 7, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE: MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REFERRAL AND RECOMMENDATION; AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Should plaintiffs wish to file a First Amended Complaint, plaintiffs shall file said pleading no later than August 3, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 17, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/19/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REFERRAL FOR REASSIGNMENT WITH RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 06/18/2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer et al v. Countrywide et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Mark J Kenney
Represented By: Jason Matthew Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide
Represented By: Jason Matthew Richardson
Represented By: Mark J Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Palmer
Represented By: Jonathan Fried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Palmer
Represented By: Jonathan Fried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?