Pileggi et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Susan Pileggi and Salvatore Pileggi
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01333
Filed: March 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT [re 68 Notice (Other) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/17/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (1/6/2014) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (12/23/2013). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/21/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER RE REQUEST TO EXTEND CASE MANAGEMENT DATES [re 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Case Management Dates by 45 Days filed by Susan Pileggi, Salvatore Pileggi]. FIRST AMENDED CASE MANAG EMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/20/2013. Jury Trial set for 1/6/2014 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Motions due by 10/24/2013. Pretrial Conference set for 12/23/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/21/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING CLASS CERTIFICATION by Hon. William Alsup denying 41 Motion to Certify Class.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED EXTENSION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Hon. William Alsup granting 47 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED EXTENSION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Hon. William Alsup granting 45 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Alsup denying 32 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 36 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO APPOINT INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL by Hon. William Alsup denying 27 Motion to Appoint Counsel.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 13 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 25, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/22/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pileggi et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Pileggi
Represented By: Willem F. Jonckheer
Represented By: Miranda Kolbe
Represented By: Randolph M. McLaughlin
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Norton
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvatore Pileggi
Represented By: Miranda Kolbe
Represented By: Willem F. Jonckheer
Represented By: Randolph M. McLaughlin
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Norton
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?